Lewis v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Lewis
Defendant: Alliant Credit Union, Trans Union LLC, Wells Fargo Bank National Association, Macys Retail Holdings Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC and LendingClub Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv03122
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 18 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number #19 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 1/11/19 (alew, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Lewis. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Trans Union LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 1/14/2019; Wells Fargo Bank National Association served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Transunion, #2 Certificate of Service Equifax, #3 Certificate of Service Wells Fargo)(Kozloski, Aaron) Modified on 1/14/2019 to correct filing date (alew, ).
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/4/19. (alew, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/25/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/8/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/1/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/1/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/1/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/1/2019, Discovery due by 7/1/2019, Motions due by 7/31/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 10/29/2019, Mediation Due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/4/19. (alew, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank National Association answer due 1/23/2019. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/2/19.(alew, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wells Fargo Bank National Association.(Calub, Brian)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P.)No proposed order.(Calub, Brian) Modified on 1/2/2019 to correct motion relief (alew, ). Modified on 1/2/2019 to edit text (alew, ).
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Calub on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Calub, Brian)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Trans Union LLC answer due 1/14/2019. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/19/18.(kmca)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Trans Union LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Johnson, Wilbur)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (abuc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alliant Credit Union, Equifax Information Services LLC, LendingClub Corporation, Macys Retail Holdings Inc, Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (abuc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patrick Lewis.(abuc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alliant Credit Union, Equifax Information Services LLC, LendingClub Corporation, Macys Retail Holdings Inc, Trans Union LLC, Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8115431.), filed by Patrick Lewis. Service due by 2/19/2019(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Brian A Calub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys Retail Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LendingClub Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Lewis
Represented By: Aaron J Kozloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?