Singletary v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Angelia Singletary
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv00043
Filed: January 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 12/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 2/13/19. (sfla)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Mediation by Angelia Singletary(Bacon, Chad)
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by Starbucks Corporation to #7 Scheduling Order,, Defendant's Statement Concerning Mediation. (Bagley, Lee)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Starbucks Corporation.(Bagley, Lee)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Starbucks Corporation.(Bagley, Lee)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Starbucks Corporation.(Bagley, Lee)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Angelia Singletary.(Bacon, Chad)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER; Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/28/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/11/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/11/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/6/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/7/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/6/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/6/2019, Discovery due by 12/6/2019, Motion in Limine due by 2/24/2020, Motions due by 12/20/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/7/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 3/2/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 3/9/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 1/8/19. (sfla)
January 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation. (sfla)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Starbucks Corporation. (sfla)
January 5, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Starbucks Corporation.(sfla)
January 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-23-5407 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8192742) filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singletary v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia Singletary
Represented By: Chad L Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Lee Ellen Bagley
Represented By: Randi Lynn Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?