Burch v. Capital One Bank USA NA
Plaintiff: Greg Burch
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA
Case Number: 6:2019cv00610
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 9/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 4/4/19. (kmca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/24/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/8/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 5/8/2019, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 5/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/18/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/19/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/19/2019, Discovery due by 9/18/2019, Motions due by 10/2/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/1/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/2/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 4/4/19. (kmca)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Greg Burch.(Lochocki, Bess)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Capital One Bank USA NA.(Rummage, Ryan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Capital One Bank USA NA.(kmca)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-23-00467. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8297934), filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch v. Capital One Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Burch
Represented By: Bess Dargan Lochocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?