Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company v. Three Blind Mice LLC
Plaintiff: Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Three Blind Mice LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00632
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT dismissing case. (sfla)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 OPINION and ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 4/30/19. (sfla)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Response filed by Three Blind Mice LLC. (kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/24/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bonnie, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY by Three Blind Mice LLC to #8 Order,, Set Deadlines, . (Shoun, Cheryl)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 OPINION and ORDER that Three Blind Mice, LLC d/b/a The Blind Horse Saloon inform the court of the citizenship of all of its members within 10 days of the date of this order. (Specific Document due by 4/15/2019). Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 4/4/19. (sfla)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Three Blind Mice LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Shoun, Cheryl)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company. Three Blind Mice LLC served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (Bonnie, John) (Main Document 5 replaced and Additional attachment provided by filing user added on 3/20/2019: #1 Summons returned executed) (sfla).
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Three Blind Mice LLC. (sfla)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company.(sfla)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Three Blind Mice LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8302672) filed by Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company. Service due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 6, 2018 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - August 27, 2018 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Policy)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company v. Three Blind Mice LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Blind Mice LLC
Represented By: Cheryl D Shoun
Represented By: Andrew Addison Mathias
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Vernon Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Brannon J Arnold
Represented By: John C Bonnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?