General Electric Company v. Davidson et al
Plaintiff: General Electric Company
Defendant: Chris Davidson and Ben Lagrange
Case Number: 6:2019cv00694
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1831
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by General Electric Company, Chris Davidson, Ben Lagrange. (Hishamunda, Honore) (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/1/2019: to replace with corrected document as provided by filing user). Modified on 8/1/2019: to add joint filers as listed (kmca).
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply filed by Chris Davidson, Ben Lagrange. (kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by General Electric Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/3/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - unpublished and/or out-of-district decisions)(Hishamunda, Honore) (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/29/2019: to replace with corrected document (footnote font) as provided by filing user) (kmca).
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Chris Davidson, Ben Lagrange. Response to Motion due by 4/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Defendants Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases)No proposed order.(Hinson, Amy Elizabeth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/15/2019: to replace with corrected document (to correct typo/dates) as requested by and provided by filing user) (kmca).
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy David St Clair on behalf of Chris Davidson, Ben Lagrange (St Clair, Timothy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Allen Hinson on behalf of Chris Davidson, Ben Lagrange (Hinson, Amy Elizabeth)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants, filed by General Electric Company. Service due by 6/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Employee Innovation and Proprietary Information Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Employee Innovation and Proprietary Information Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Non-Solicitation Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Non-Solicitation Agreement) (Hishamunda, Honore) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/1/2019: to replace with corrected document (footnote size) as provided by filing user) (kmca).
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Electric Company. Chris Davidson served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; Ben Lagrange served on 3/9/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service - Davidson, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service - Lagrange)(kmca) Re-filed by clerk to correct event and add main document.(kmca)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Hishamunda, Honore)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chris Davidson, Ben Lagrange. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lagrange)(kmca)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by General Electric Company.(kmca)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Davidson, Ben Lagrange (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8312476), filed by General Electric Company. Service due by 6/6/2019.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Electric Company v. Davidson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Davidson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Allen Hinson
Represented By: Timothy David St Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Lagrange
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Allen Hinson
Represented By: Timothy David St Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Electric Company
Represented By: Honore Hishamunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?