Michelin North America Inc v. Dotson
Plaintiff: Michelin North America Inc
Defendant: Michael Dotson
Case Number: 6:2019cv01338
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/24/19. (kmca)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/15/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/29/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/29/2019, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 7/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/9/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/9/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/8/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/8/2019, Discovery due by 12/9/2019, Motions due by 12/23/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/24/19. (kmca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Dotson.(kmca) Document removed from [7-1] and filed as a separate entry by clerk (kmca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Michael Dotson. (Attachments: # 1 LR 26.01 Answers) (Miller, Bruce) Modified on 6/20/2019: to remove attachment and file separately as #8 LR 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories (kmca).
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelin North America Inc. Michael Dotson served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Defendant Michael Dotson)(Quattlebaum, James)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Dotson. (kmca)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michelin North America Inc.(kmca)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Dotson (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8431280), filed by Michelin North America Inc. Service due by 8/5/2019.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelin North America Inc v. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dotson
Represented By: Bruce E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelin North America Inc
Represented By: Denny Parker Major
Represented By: James Derrick Quattlebaum
Represented By: Jonathan David Klett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?