Aiken v. Zax LLC

Plaintiff: Dameka Aiken
Defendant: Zax LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01371
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Zax LLC. (Kilgore, Phillip) Modified on 7/8/2019: to add joint filer as listed (kmca).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/21/19. (kmca)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/7/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/21/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 6/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/11/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/11/2019, Discovery due by 11/12/2019, Motions due by 1/13/2020, Mediation Due by 12/12/2019. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 5/17/2019. (gpre, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Zax LLC.(Kilgore, Phillip)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dameka Aiken.(Murphy, Brian)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Zax LLC.(abuc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-23-01731. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8437030), filed by Zax LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aiken v. Zax LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameka Aiken
Represented By: Brian P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zax LLC
Represented By: Phillip Arthur Kilgore
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?