Rogers et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Eden Rogers and Brandy Welch
Defendant: Alex Azar, Michael Leach, Lynn Johnson, Administration for Children and Families, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Henry McMaster and Steven Wagner
Case Number: 6:2019cv01567
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from Case Number 6:19-cv-03551-TMC and 6:19-cv-01567-TMC to 6:19-cv-03551-DCC and 6:19-cv-01567-DCC. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-03551-DCC, 6:19-cv-01567-DCC(abuc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 71 Case Reassigned to Judge Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Timothy M Cain no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 70 Letter from Federal Defendants re: (Notice Regarding Notice of Nonenforcement and Notice of Proposed Rulemaking). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of nonenforcement, #2 Exhibit B - NPRM)(Newman, Christie) Modified on 11/5/2019: to add text (Federal Defendants) (kmca).
October 21, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Miles Edward Coleman for November 13-15, 2019. (Coleman, Miles)
October 11, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Sherri A. Lydon, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner. (Newman, Christie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Michael Leach. (Woodington, Kenneth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Henry McMaster. (Coleman, Miles)
October 8, 2019 Filing 64 TEXT ORDER granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Derek K Mong added for Plaintiffs. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/8/19.(kmca)
October 8, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek K. Mong ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8712032) by Eden Rogers. Response to Motion due by 10/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Dismiss , #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #50 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Shutt, Nekki)
September 27, 2019 Filing 60 TEXT ORDER granting #59 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 9/27/19.(kmca)
September 26, 2019 Filing 59 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Shutt, Nekki)
August 30, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss by Henry McMaster. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter from Gov. McMaster to Steven Wagner (Feb. 27, 2018), #2 Exhibit B: Executive Order 2018-12 (March 18, 2018), #3 Exhibit C: letter from Steven Wagner to Gov. McMaster (Jan. 23, 2019))No proposed order.(Coleman, Miles)
August 30, 2019 Filing 56 TEXT ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #50 MOTION to Dismiss, and #57 Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Replies due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/30/19.(alew, ) Modified on 9/27/2019: to add link to #57 Motion to Dismiss (included in extension) (kmca).
August 30, 2019 Filing 55 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Leach.(Woodington, Kenneth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response to Motion due by 9/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Michael Leach. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 MOTION to Dismiss by Eden Rogers, Alan Wilson, Brandy Welch, Steven Wagner, United States Department of Health and Human Service, Henry McMaster, Sherri A. Lydon, Michael Leach, Lynn Johnson, Alex Azar. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 8/30/2019 to add parties listed as filers (alew, ).
August 29, 2019 Filing 51 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Sherri A. Lydon, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner.(Newman, Christie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss by Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Sherri A. Lydon, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Request for Deviation or Exception)No proposed order.(Newman, Christie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 49 TEXT ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James Ryan Powers for Defendants Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Sherri A. Lydon, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/28/19.(kmca)
August 28, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Ryan Powers by Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Sherri A. Lydon, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit, #2 Texas Bar Certificate)No proposed order.(Newman, Christie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Kenneth Paul Woodington for August 30, 2019 through September 13, 2019 (Woodington, Kenneth)
August 23, 2019 Filing 45 TEXT ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/23/19.(kmca)
August 22, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Henry McMaster. Response to Motion due by 9/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bercot, Ethan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 43 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Henry McMaster has filed a motion to stay the proceedings in this case. (ECF No. #32 ). The other Defendants have consented to this motion. (ECF Nos. #41 , #42 ). McMaster and the other Defendants have also filed motions for extension of time to respond to the complaint to allow the court to rule on the motion to stay. (ECF Nos. #32 , #33 , #36 ).Defendant McMaster contends that the court should stay this action pending resolution of the motions to dismiss filed in a related case, Maddonna v. U.S. Dep't of Health & Human Servs., No. 6:19-cv-448-TMC (D.S.C. 2019). He contends that, because the two cases present similar factual and legal issues, a stay would simplify the issues, alleviate unnecessary hardship on Defendants caused by duplicative litigation, and impose no prejudice on Plaintiffs.In their response, Plaintiffs argue, inter alia, that a stay would not promote judicial economy because the issues in Madonna are different and that a stay would substantially prejudice Plaintiffs as they face barriers to their ability to foster a child and unduly delay their vindication of a constitutional right. Plaintiffs also argue that the motion to stay (and the motions for extensions) are untimely.Incidental to its power to control its docket, a district court has the inherent power to stay proceedings. Landis v. N. Am. Co., 299 U.S. 248, 25455 (1936). In deciding a motion to stay, a court should consider three factors, including: "(1) the interests of judicial economy; (2) hardship and inequity to the moving party if the action is not stayed; and (3) potential prejudice to the non-moving party." Murphy-Pittman v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. No. 3:12-cv-3179-JFA, 2012 WL 6588697, *2 (D. S. C. Dec. 17, 2012) (citations omitted). First, the court finds that the motions to stay and for extension are not untimely as they were filed prior to the lapse of the time to respond to the complaint. See Rule 6(b)(1)(A) (providing that "[w]hen an act may or must be done within a specified time, the court may, for good cause, extend the time: (A) with or without motion or notice if the court acts, or if a request is made, before the original time or its extension expires"). Second, reviewing the allegations in the two cases, the court finds that the issues in Maddonna are different. Maddonnna involves only alleged religious discrimination and, here, there is the additional allegation regarding discrimination against a same sex couple. While there may be some issues which could overlap between the two cases, the issues are not the same, and this weighs against Defendants' argument that a stay is needed to avoid duplicative litigation. Moreover, a stay would arguably prejudice Plaintiff by delaying a resolution of this litigation. See Klaver Constr. Co., Inc. v. Kan. Dep't of Transp., No. 992510, 2001 WL 1000679, at *23 (D. Kan. Aug. 23, 2001) (recognizing a "plaintiff's interest in seeking vindication for alleged constitutional violations" and denying a request for a stay). Moreover, the fact that Plaintiffs seek injunctive relief against ongoing and future harm further counsels against a stay. See Lockyer v. Mirant Corp., 398 F.3d 1098, 1112 (9th Cir. 2005). Weighing these factors, the court finds that a stay is not warranted at this time. Accordingly, based on the foregoing, Defendants' motion for a Stay (ECF No. #32 ) is DENIED; and Defendants' Motions for Extensions (ECF Nos. #32 , #33 , #36 ) are GRANTED. Defendants shall have until August 30, 2019, to file a response to the Complaint. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/15/19.(kmca)
August 13, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Response filed by Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Sherri A. Lydon, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner. (Newman, Christie)
August 13, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Response filed by Michael Leach. (Woodington, Kenneth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Stay Proceedingspending the court's resolution of dispositive motions filed in related case, Maddonna v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al, No. 6:19-cv-00448-TMC, #32 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint Response filed by Henry McMaster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Correspondence between Gov. McMaster's counsel and Plaintiffs' counsel (June 27, 2019);, #2 Exhibit B: Correspondence between Gov. McMaster's counsel and Plaintiffs' counsel (July 23, 2019).)(Coleman, Miles)
August 6, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Stay Proceedingspending the court's resolution of dispositive motions filed in related case, Maddonna v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al, No. 6:19-cv-00448-TMC, #33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , #32 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint Response filed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/13/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Burnette, Mary)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Defendant Henry McMaster ("McMaster") has filed a motion to stay all proceedings in this action pending the resolution of dispositive motions in what is described as a related action in Madonna v. United States Dep't of Health and Human Servs. et al, C/A No. 6:19-cv-448-TMC (D.S.C. 2019). (ECF No. #31 .) Plaintiff's response to the motion to stay is due by August 6, 2019. Defendants McMaster and Michael Leach have each filed a second motion for extension of the time to answer the complaint. (ECF Nos. #32 , #33 .) Plaintiff's response to these motions is due by August 6, 2019. Defendants United States Department of Health and Human Services, Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, and Steven Wagner also seek an extension of time to respond to the complaint. (ECF No. #36 .) Plaintiff's response to this motion is due by August 7, 2019.The court is of the opinion that the subject motions should be fully briefed and is not inclined to reduce the time for Plaintiffs to respond. In light of the deadlines for filing responses to the motions, and so as to provide Plaintiffs the opportunity to fully respond, the deadlines for all Defendants to answer and/or otherwise plead or respond to the complaint shall be temporarily stayed pending receipt of the Plaintiffs' responses to the motions filed at docket entries #31 , #32 , #33 , and #36 , and further order of the court. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 7/25/19.(kmca)
July 24, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Sherri A. Lydon, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Newman, Christie)
July 24, 2019 Filing 35 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Leach.(Woodington, Kenneth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry McMaster.(Coleman, Miles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Michael Leach. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 32 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Henry McMaster. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Coleman, Miles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending the court's resolution of dispositive motions filed in related case, Maddonna v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al, No. 6:19-cv-00448-TMC by Henry McMaster. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Coleman, Miles) Modified on 7/24/2019: to add text (related case) (kmca).
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Henry McMaster's answer due 7/30/19. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/28/19.(kmca)
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Henry McMaster. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' counsel's consent to extension)No proposed order.(Coleman, Miles)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Michael Leach answer due 7/30/2019. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/26/19.(kmca)
June 25, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel Mach added for Plaintiffs. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/25/19.(kmca)
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Michael Leach. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Leslie Cooper for Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/14/19.(alew, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel I. Mach ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8503969) by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Response to Motion due by 6/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supporting Documents Application & Affidavit, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, State of New York). Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 6/14/2019 to add party listed as filer (alew, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/25/2019: to replace with corrected document (current date) as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 6/25/2019, as provide by filing user: #4 Certificate of Good Standing, District of Columbia) (kmca).
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie J. Cooper ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8503953) by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Response to Motion due by 6/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supporting Documents Application & Affidavit, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 6/14/2019 to add party listed as filer (alew, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Henry McMaster served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service upon Henry McMaster)(Shutt, Nekki)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #17 Summons Returned Executed for Henry McMaster. Reason: attorney re-filed to correct service information. Corrected Filing Document Number #19 Summons Returned Executed for Henry McMaster. (kmca)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Michael Leach served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service upon Michael Leach)(Shutt, Nekki)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Alan Wilson served on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service upon SC Attorney General Alan Wilson)(Shutt, Nekki)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Sherri A. Lydon served on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service upon the United States Attorney for the District of South Carolina)(Shutt, Nekki)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Katherine D Janson, Peter T Barbur, Cathren I Cohen, M Currey Cook, and Karen L Loewy added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/7/19.(kmca)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen L. Loewy ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8491982) by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Application & Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 6/7/2019: to add additional filer as listed (kmca).
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M.Currey Cook ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8491958) by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supporting Documents Application & Affidavit, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 6/7/2019: to add additional filer as listed (kmca).
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cathren I. Cohen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8491927) by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supporting Documents Application & Affidavit, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 6/7/2019: to add additional filer as listed (kmca).
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter T. Barbur ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8491858) by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supporting Documents Application & Affidavit, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 6/7/2019: to add additional filer as listed (kmca).
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine D. Janson Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8491683) by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supporting Documents Application & Affidavit, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 6/7/2019: to add additional filer as listed (kmca).
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. United States Attorney General served on 6/3/19, answer due 8/2/19. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon United States Attorney General, #2 United States Postal Service Return Receipt)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Administration for Children and Families served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019; Alex Azar served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019; Lynn Johnson served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019; Steven Wagner served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service upon the United States Department of Health and Human Services, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Affidavit Service upon Alex Azar, #4 Notice of Filing, #5 Affidavit Service upon the Administration for Children and Families, #6 Notice of Filing, #7 Affidavit Service upon Lynn Johnson, #8 Notice of Filing, #9 Affidavit Service upon Steven Wagner)(kmca) Documents re-filed by clerk to correct event and answer due date. (kmca)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons South Carolina Attorney General)(kmca)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Michael Leach, Henry McMaster, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner. (kmca)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch.(kmca)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administration for Children and Families, Alex Azar, Lynn Johnson, Michael Leach, Henry McMaster, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8472786), filed by Eden Rogers, Brandy Welch. Service due by 8/28/2019.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Christie V Newman
Represented By: James Ryan Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Leach
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Johnson
Represented By: Christie V Newman
Represented By: James Ryan Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration for Children and Families
Represented By: Christie V Newman
Represented By: James Ryan Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Christie V Newman
Represented By: James Ryan Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry McMaster
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Represented By: Ethan Jonathan Bercot
Represented By: Miles Edward Coleman
Represented By: Jay Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wagner
Represented By: Christie V Newman
Represented By: James Ryan Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Rogers
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Mary Malissa Burnette
Represented By: Nekki Shutt
Represented By: Leslie Jill Cooper
Represented By: Cathren Irene Cohen
Represented By: Karen Lee Loewy
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Peter T Barbur
Represented By: Katherine D Janson
Represented By: Derek Kinwai Mong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Welch
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Mary Malissa Burnette
Represented By: Nekki Shutt
Represented By: Leslie Jill Cooper
Represented By: Cathren Irene Cohen
Represented By: Karen Lee Loewy
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Peter T Barbur
Represented By: Katherine D Janson
Represented By: Derek Kinwai Mong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?