Prior v. State of SC, The
Plaintiff: Ashley T Prior
Defendant: State of SC, The, John B McCree, James and Joan 1-10 Doe, John and Jane 1-10 Does, Sheriff of Columbia and Bryan P Stirling
Case Number: 6:2019cv01619
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Ashley T Prior 290973 ICS 163-BF2 Kirkland Correctional Institution 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210 with AO240 application, blank summons and 10 USM285 forms (kric, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 THIRD PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/8/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/29/19. (ctuc, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, Court's complaint form, AO240, financial certificate,summons, USM-285, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Ashley T Prior 290973 ICS 163-BF2 Kirkland Correctional Institution 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210 (gpre, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 7/15/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/3/19. (ctuc, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Ashley T Prior with blank complaint, Summons, USM285 form, AO240 and Financial Certificate as directed. (kric, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 6/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Honorable Kevin F. McDonald on 6/7/2019. (kric, ) Modified on 6/7/2019 to edit Judge name(kric, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prior v. State of SC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley T Prior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of SC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B McCree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James and Joan 1-10 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?