Doe v. One Source Technology LLC
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: One Source Technology LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01749
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/16/2019.(abuc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pamela Q. Devata ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8618856) by One Source Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Quattlebaum, James)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 9/30/2019 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/15/2019. (abuc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/4/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/29/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/25/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/23/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/13/2020, Discovery due by 2/11/2020, Motion in Limine due by 4/13/2020, Motions due by 2/25/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/20/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 5/11/2020, Mediation Due by 3/10/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/15/2019. (abuc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by One Source Technology LLC.(Quattlebaum, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by One Source Technology LLC.(Quattlebaum, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response to Motion due by 8/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ), MOTION to Strike by One Source Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Quattlebaum, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #4 motion to proceed pseudonymously. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/31/2019.(abuc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. One Source Technology LLC answer due 8/14/2019. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/12/19.(alew, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by One Source Technology LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Quattlebaum, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. One Source Technology LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maxfield, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to One Source Technology LLC. (abuc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously by John Doe. Response to Motion due by 7/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(abuc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Doe.(abuc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One Source Technology LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8513271.), filed by John Doe. Service due by 9/17/2019(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. One Source Technology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Source Technology LLC
Represented By: Pamela Q Devata
Represented By: James Derrick Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?