United States of America v. 74800 dollars in US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 74800 dollars in US Currency
Case Number: 6:2019cv01762
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $74,800.00 in US Currency. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED. (kmca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM by United States of America. (kmca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem, against 74800 dollars in US Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Agent Paul Criswell)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 74800 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 74800 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?