Bennett v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Ortagus Demetrice Bennett
Defendant: James & Joan Doe 1-10, Randy Smith, John Garrett and John & Jane Doe 1-10
Case Number: 6:2019cv01799
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 ***DOCUMENTs HAND DELIVERED: #12 Order with NEF #13 , REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION with NEF, given to Ortagus Demetrice Bennett at the counter of the Greenville Clerks Office. (kmca)
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Report and Recommendation, MOTION to send all mail certified to Plaintiff by Ortagus Demetrice Bennett. (Response to Motion due by 8/29/2019.) No proposed order.(kmca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #19 Order adopting Report and Recommendation, #20 Judgment, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Ortagus Demetrice Bennett, 504 Piedmont Golf Course Road, Piedmont, SC 29673. (kmca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 JUDGMENT that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Furthermore, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. (kmca)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER adopting #13 Report and Recommendation. The complaint (ECF No. #1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Furthermore, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/5/19. (kmca)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ortagus Demetrice Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information)(kmca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 14 Transfer of Case Management, #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Ortagus Demetrice Bennett, #12 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Ortagus Demetrice Bennett 504 Piedmont Golf Course Road Piedmont, SC 29673 (kric, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Timothy M Cain. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: US District Court, 300 E Washington Street, Greenville, SC 29601. (kric, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district court dismiss this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. The undersigned also recommends that the court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/16/19. (ctuc, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/16/19. (ctuc, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Ortagus Demetrice Bennett 504 Piedmont Golf Course Road Piedmont, SC 29673 (kric, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Deficiency Memo Proof of Service See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. (kric, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ortagus Demetrice Bennett.(kric, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (kric, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ortagus Demetrice Bennett.(kric, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James & Joan Doe 1-10, John & Jane Doe 1-10, John Garrett, Randy Smith ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX600008318.), filed by Ortagus Demetrice Bennett. Service due by 9/23/2019(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James & Joan Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ortagus Demetrice Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?