McDaniels v. J Reuben Long Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Lamar McDaniels
Defendant: J Reuben Long Detention Center and Medicko
Case Number: 6:2019cv01820
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kevin McDonald
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #14 Report and Recommendation by Lamar McDaniels. Reply to Objections due by 8/26/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Lamar McDaniels, #13 Order - 1983 - No Service placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Lamar McDaniels HC11141835434 J Reuben Long Detention Center 4150 J Reuben Long Avenue Conway, SC 29526 (kric, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this action be dismissed with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 8/19/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/5/19. (ctuc, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/5/19. (ctuc, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Lamar McDaniels, HC11141835434J Reuben Long Detention Center,4150 J Reuben Long Avenue,Conway, SC 29526 (jtho, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The plaintiff's complaint is subject to dismissal as it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his complaint identified above by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. Amended complaint due 7/26/19. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/12/19. (ctuc, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Lamar McDaniels HC11141835434 J Reuben Long Detention Center 4150 J Reuben Long Avenue Conway, SC 29526 with blank summons and 2 USM285 forms (kric, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 7/23/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/2/19. (ctuc, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (kric, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Lamar McDaniels. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lamar McDaniels. Service due by 9/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Dates of Grievances, #2 exhibit letter, #3 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniels v. J Reuben Long Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Reuben Long Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?