Franklin v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Landis Deluan Franklin
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv02255
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Transfer of Case Management, #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Landis Deluan Franklin, #14 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Landis Deluan Franklin 101 S Kings Drive Fountain Inn, SC 29644 (gpre, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Timothy M. Cain. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 300 East Washington Street, Greenville SC 29601. (gpre, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommends that the District Court dismiss this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/18/2019. (gpre, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service. This case is subject to summary dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/18/2019. (gpre, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #9 Proper Form Order, #10 Order, Complaint form, Summons form, USM-285 form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Landis Deluan Franklin 101 S Kings Drive Fountain Inn, SC 29644 (gpre, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Plaintiff is granted twenty one (21) days from the date this Order is entered (plus three days for mail time) to file an amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) that corrects deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies identified, this action will be recommended for summary dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/19/2019. (gpre, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 9/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/19/2019. (gpre, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/19/2019.(gpre, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Landis Deluan Franklin. Response to Motion due by 8/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Landis Deluan Franklin.(gpre, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Landis Deluan Franklin. Service due by 11/7/2019(gpre, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Complaint on court form, #2 Exhibit Court orders, #3 Supporting Documents, #4 Envelope) (gpre, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landis Deluan Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?