Monroe v. Brawo USA Inc
Plaintiff: Thomas Monroe
Defendant: Brawo USA Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02268
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION The undersigned recommends that the defendant's #11 partial motion to dismiss be granted without prejudice as to the Title VII cause of action and be denied as to the breach of contract cause of action. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 10/23/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/9/19. (ctuc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Brawo USA Inc. (Gantt-Sorenson, Christine)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Thomas Monroe.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Summerlin, Jeremy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Brawo USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Case Law)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Gantt-Sorenson, Christine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Brawo USA Inc.(Gantt-Sorenson, Christine)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas Monroe.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Laurens County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgment of Removal)(Gantt-Sorenson, Christine)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #1 Reason: Refiled by clerk to correct event type. Corrected Filing Document Number #1 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 8/13/2019 (gpre, ) Modified on 8/13/2019 to indicate that the notice of removal had been renumbered as document #1 (sfla).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Laurens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-30-00607. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8610440), filed by Brawo USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(gpre, ) Refiled by Clerk to correct event type. Modified on 8/13/2019 to correct document number back to document 1 (sfla). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/14/2019) (gpre, ).
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories due fourteen (14) days after service of Notice of Removal. (gpre, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brawo USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Brawo USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Monroe
Represented By: Jeremy Randall Summerlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brawo USA Inc
Represented By: Demetrius Donte Pyburn
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?