Ray v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Dorothy A Ray
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 6:2019cv02308
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/2/19. (sfla)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Dorothy A Ray (Bax, Nathaniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; Joint Stipulation Deadline 12/3/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/9/19. (sfla)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/9/19. (sfla)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shuler, Franklin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shuler, Franklin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy A Ray. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (sfla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dorothy A Ray.(sfla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8618564) filed by Dorothy A Ray. Service due by 11/14/2019(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy A Ray
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Franklin Grady Shuler, Jr
Represented By: Catherine Mallory Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?