Windley v. Parks Buick GMC LLC
Plaintiff: Twanja L Windley
Defendant: Parks Buick GMC LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv02538
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Twanja L Windley.(Phillips, Shannon)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Twanja L Windley.(Phillips, Shannon)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Parks Buick GMC LLC.(Jenkins, Amy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Parks Buick GMC LLC.(Jenkins, Amy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Parks Buick GMC LLC.(Jenkins, Amy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Parks Buick GMC LLC.(Jenkins, Amy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Parks Buick GMC LLC, filed by Twanja L Windley. Service due by 1/6/2020 (Phillips, Shannon)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/16/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/30/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/20/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/21/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 5/22/2020, Mediation Due by 4/22/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/25/2019. (gpre, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Twanja L Windley.(Phillips, Shannon)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Greenville County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Acknowledgment of Filing Notice of Removal)(Jenkins, Amy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: Plaintiff's answers to LR26.01 interrogatories are due 14 days after service of Notice of Removal. (gpre, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Parks Buick GMC LLC.(gpre, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Parks Buick GMC LLC.(gpre, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-23-04597. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8658787), filed by Parks Buick GMC LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Fiing)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windley v. Parks Buick GMC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parks Buick GMC LLC
Represented By: David Mittel
Represented By: Amy Yager Jenkins
Represented By: Jonathan Gregory Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twanja L Windley
Represented By: Shannon Metz Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?