Johnson v. Apple Inc et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Johnson
Defendant: Apple Inc and Tim Cook
Case Number: 6:2019cv02548
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #18 Notice of Appeal, #19 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, and docket sheet placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Christopher Lee Johnson, 203 Dovie Drive, Greer, SC 29651 (cbru, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #18 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (cbru, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #18 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (cbru, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #15 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation by Christopher Lee Johnson. - Filing fee unpaid. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cbru, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Judgment, #15 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Christopher Lee Johnson 203 Dovie Drive Greer, SC 29651 (gpre, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 JUDGMENT amended complaint dismissed with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. (gpre, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopts #10 Report and Recommendation. Amended complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/30/2019. (gpre, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendation by Christopher Lee Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cbru, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 11 Transfer of Case Management, #9 Order, #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Christopher Lee Johnson 203 Dovie Drive Greer, SC 29651 (gpre, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Mary Geiger Lewis. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street, Columbia SC 29201. (gpre, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommends #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Lee Johnson be dismissed pursuant to 1915(e)(2)(B)1 without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/18/2019. (gpre, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/18/2019. (gpre, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/18/2019.(gpre, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (gpre, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Christopher Lee Johnson. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Lee Johnson.(gpre, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc, Tim Cook, filed by Christopher Lee Johnson. Service due by 12/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Statement of Claim, #4 Envelope)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?