McCuen v. Pharmacy Innovations
Plaintiff: David E McCuen
Defendant: Pharmacy Innovations
Case Number: 6:2019cv02602
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 11/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/13/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/12/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/12/2020, Discovery due by 4/13/2020, Motions due by 6/12/2020, Mediation Due by 5/13/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/18/2019. (gpre, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by PI Corporate Support Services LLC,.(Gay, Reginald) Modified on 10/16/2019 to correct filer(gpre, ).
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David E McCuen.(Thompson, Charles)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 Withdrawal of Motions: #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pharmacy Innovations.(gpre, ) Refiled by Clerk to correct event type.
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PI Corporate Support Services LLC, filed by David E McCuen. Service due by 1/2/2020 (Thompson, Charles) Modified on 10/4/2019 to edit text (gpre, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by David E McCuen.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit service related documents)(Thompson, Charles)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER. New case number is 6-19-cv -2602-TMC-JDA. Please make a note of it for all future filings as well as Judge's preferences. (kmca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Pharmacy Innovations. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(kmca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pharmacy Innovations.(kmca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pharmacy Innovations.(kmca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-23-04850. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8668852), filed by Pharmacy Innovations. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCuen v. Pharmacy Innovations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E McCuen
Represented By: Charles F Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Michael D Malone
Represented By: Lake E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Innovations
Represented By: Reginald Michael Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?