Brown v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Doron H Brown
Defendant: Allen Freeman and Chuck Wright
Case Number: 6:2019cv02856
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Doron H Brown Spartanburg County Detention Center 950 California Avenue Spartanburg, SC 29303 with blank summons (kric, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/13/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/3/19. (ctuc, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTIONS by Doron H Brown to #10 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Doron H Brown Spartanburg County Detention Center 950 California Avenue Spartanburg, SC 29303 with summons and 285 forms as directed. (kric, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/14/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiff's #2 IFP motion is granted. The plaintiff's #3 #4 #5 motions for appointment of counsel, to certify class and for joinder are denied. The plaintiff is directed to always keep the Clerk informed of any change of address. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/24/19. (ctuc, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Spartanburg. (kric, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Joinder by Doron H Brown. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class by Doron H Brown. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Doron H Brown. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of plaintiff)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Doron H Brown. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Doron H Brown. Service due by 1/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Mail Regulations document, #2 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doron H Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?