Childress v. Portfolio Recovery Associates
Plaintiff: Takitti Shava Childress
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates
Case Number: 6:2019cv02931
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #17 Order adopting Report and Recommendation, #18 Judgment, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Takitti Shava Childress, 100 Gateway Blvd, Unit 114, Greenville, SC 29607 (kmca)
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 JUDGMENT that this case is dismissed. (kmca)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting #12 Report and Recommendation. The case is DISMISSED without leave to amend and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/13/19. (kmca)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Transfer of Case Management, #11 Order, #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Takitti Shava Childress 100 Gateway Blvd Unit 114 Greenville, SC 29607 (gpre, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Timothy M. Cain. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: United States District Court, 300 East Washington Street, Greenville SC 29601. (gpre, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the District Court dismiss this action without leave to amend and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 12/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/21/2019. (gpre, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/21/2019. (gpre, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Order, #7 Proper Form Order, Summons form, USM-285 form, LR 26.01 interrogatories, Court's Amended Complaint form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Takitti Shava Childress 100 Gateway Blvd Unit 114 Greenville, SC 29607 (gpre, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT. Plaintiff is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date this Order is entered (plus three days for mail time) to file an Amended Complaint that corrects the deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/22/2019. (gpre, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff's attention is directed to the Order regarding amendment filed contemporaneously with this Order. Case to be brought into proper form by 11/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/22/2019. (gpre, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2019: #1 Pro Se Party's Rule 26.01 Interrogatories) (gpre, ).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/22/2019.(gpre, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (gpre, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Takitti Shava Childress. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, filed by Takitti Shava Childress. Service due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Violation FCRA, #2 Envelope)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childress v. Portfolio Recovery Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takitti Shava Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?