Oppenheimer v. Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation Inc, Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc, WSPA LLC and Nexstar Broadcasting
Case Number: 6:2019cv03274
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Nexstar Broadcasting waiver executed on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit waiver Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.)(Allen, Samuel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation Inc waiver executed on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation, Inc.)(Allen, Samuel)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc waiver executed on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Allen, Samuel) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/9/2019: to replace with corrected document (cover page signed by attorney) as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 12/9/2019: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc) (kmca).
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Dana Andrew LeJune and Scott Michael Francis added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/2/19.(kmca)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Michael Francis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8800504) by David Oppenheimer. Response to Motion due by 12/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application with Certificates of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Allen, Samuel) (Main Document 10: to replace with corrected document (motion) as provided by filing user). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/2/2019: to add pro hac vice application) (kmca).
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dana Andrew LeJune (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8800441) by David Oppenheimer. Response to Motion due by 12/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application with Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Court Admissions and Dates DAL)No proposed order.(Allen, Samuel) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/2/2019: to replace with corrected document (motion) as provided by filing user). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/2/2019: to add pro hac vice application) (kmca).
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #7 Report on the Filing of Copyright, to Copyright Office (508filings@loc.gov). (kmca)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (kmca)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc, Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation Inc, Nexstar Broadcasting, WSPA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation Inc, #2 Summons WSPA LLC, #3 Summons Nexstar Broadcasting)(kmca) NOTE: summons reissued to correct typo in party caption as requested by and provided by filing user. (kmca)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc, Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation Inc, Nexstar Broadcasting, WSPA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation Inc, #2 Summons WSPA LLC, #3 Summons Nexstar Broadcasting)(kmca)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Oppenheimer.(kmca) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/22/2019: to correct typo in party caption as provided by filing user) (kmca).
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc, Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation Inc, Nexstar Broadcasting, WSPA LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8788374), filed by David Oppenheimer. Service due by 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Samuel K Allen
Represented By: Scott Michael Francis
Represented By: Dana Andrew Lejune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville Zoo Educational Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of the Greenville Zoo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSPA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexstar Broadcasting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?