United States of America v. 58223.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 58223.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Travis Turner
Case Number: 6:2020cv00022
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The claimant shall have an additional 60 days to file an answer. Answer due 4/10/20. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 2/10/20.(sfla)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 02/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Travis Turner. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Moorman, Andrew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 CLAIM Possessory/Ownership by Travis Turner. (Attachments: #1 Addendum Verified Claim)(Moorman, Andrew) Modified to correct filer and to edit text on 1/21/2020 (abuc).
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $58,223.00. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem)(Sherard, Carrie)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (abuc)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (abuc)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 58223.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 4/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Verification)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 58223.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 58223.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Travis Turner
Represented By: Andrew Burke Moorman
Represented By: Ryan L Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?