Knox v. Magera et al
Plaintiff: Tito Knox
Defendant: Sergio A Sanchez MD and Elizabeth G Magera
Case Number: 6:2020cv00228
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENT by Tito Knox to #27 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 32 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 31 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tito Knox 107 Saxon Drive Piedmont, SC 29673. (mmcd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 31 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Henry M. Herlong, Jr. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 300 East Washington Street Greenville, SC 29601. (mmcd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 30 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #27 Notice of Appeal Electronic record successfully transmitted. (mmcd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 29 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #28 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, #27 Notice of Appeal and public view of docket placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tito Knox 107 Saxon Drive Piedmont, SC 29673. (mmcd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 28 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #27 Notice of Appeal. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (mmcd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #24 Order by Tito Knox. - The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mmcd) Supplement filed as separate entry #34 on 3/18/2020 (abuc).
March 10, 2020 Filing 26 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #24 Order, #25 Amended Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tito Knox, 107 Saxon Drive, Piedmont, SC 29673 (bgoo)
March 10, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED JUDGMENT dismissing this matter with prejudice. (bgoo) (Main Document 25 replaced on 3/10/2020 with corrected scan of document.) (bgoo)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER finding that Knox's #23 supplement does not alter the court's analysis in its March 4, 2020 #20 Order. Therefore, this matter is summarily dismissed with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 3/9/20. (bgoo)
March 6, 2020 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT by Tito Knox to #18 Objection to Report and Recommendation. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (mmcd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #21 Judgment, #20 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tito Knox, 107 Saxon Drive, Piedmont, SC 29673 (bgoo)
March 4, 2020 Filing 21 JUDGMENT dismissing the action with prejudice. (bgoo)
March 4, 2020 Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER adopting the #16 Report and Recommendation and summarily dismissing Knox's amended complaint with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 3/4/20. (bgoo)
March 2, 2020 Filing 18 OBJECTION to #16 Report and Recommendation by Tito Knox. Reply to Objections due by 3/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents - interrogatories, #2 Envelope) (bgoo) [Supplement added on 3/6/2020 at #23 .
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tito Knox 107 Saxon Drive Piedmont, SC 29673. (mmcd)
February 21, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #12 Amended Complaint be summarily dismissed with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 2/20/2020. (mmcd)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tito Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mmcd)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elizabeth G Magera and Sergio A Sanchez MD, filed by Tito Knox. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (mmcd)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tito Knox 107 Saxon Drive Piedmont, SC 29673. (mmcd)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT granting Plaintiff twenty-one (21) days from the date this order is entered to file an amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) that corrects the deficiencies identified in this order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that corrects those deficiencies, this action will be recommended for summary dismissal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Amended Complaint due by 2/21/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 1/30/2020. (mmcd)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #8 Proper Form Order, blank Summons form, two USM-285 Forms, and Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.) Interrogatories placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tito Knox 107 Saxon Drive Piedmont, SC 29673. (mmcd)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 2/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.), Motions granted: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 1/30/2020. (mmcd) Modified on 1/31/2020 to edit text (mmcd).
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 4 Reason: Nature of suit changed from a 550 to a 440. Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A (mmcd)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tito Knox. Response to Motion due by 2/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (mmcd)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tito Knox. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (mmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Magera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio A Sanchez MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth G Magera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tito Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?