Cosby v. South Carolina Probation Parole and Pardon Services
Plaintiff: Kristin Cosby
Defendant: South Carolina Probation Parole and Pardon Services
Case Number: 6:2020cv00655
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommends that Defendant's motion to dismiss #6 be GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claims for fraud and defamation but DENIED as to Plaintiff's Title VII claims. Objections to R&R due by 4/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/24/2020. (gpre, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by South Carolina Probation Parole and Pardon Services. (Morgan, Richard)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Kristin Cosby.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/2/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC form)(Atkinson, Courtney) Modified on 2/26/2020 to add description to attachment(gpre, ).
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kristin Cosby.(Atkinson, Courtney)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Courtney C Atkinson for 3/11/20-3/16/20, 4/22/20-4/27/20 (Atkinson, Courtney)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by South Carolina Probation Parole and Pardon Services. Response to Motion due by 2/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Def's. Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Morgan, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/11/2020: to replace with corrected document (footnote size) as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 2/11/2020: as provided by filing user: #2 Exhibit A transcript excerpts 5-15-19) (kmca).
February 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due no later than 14 days after receiving Notice of Removal. (gpre, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Probation Parole and Pardon Services.(gpre, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-23-07537. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8931212), filed by South Carolina Probation Parole and Pardon Services. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosby v. South Carolina Probation Parole and Pardon Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Cosby
Represented By: Courtney C Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Probation Parole and Pardon Services
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Richard J Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?