Jennings v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Kathleen Jennings
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 6:2020cv00869
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/17/20. (alew, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/8/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/22/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 5/22/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/12/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/12/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/12/2020, Discovery due by 10/13/2020, Motions due by 11/12/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 2/10/2021, Mediation Due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/17/20. (alew, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. Response to Motion due by 5/1/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Tillman, Matthew) Modified on 4/17/2020 to edit text (alew, ).
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Tillman, Matthew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Tillman, Matthew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 6 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number #7 (alew, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Jennings. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Acceptance of Service DOI)(Johnson, Townes)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (alew, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kathleen Jennings.(alew, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8972286.), filed by Kathleen Jennings. Service due by 5/27/2020(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Jennings
Represented By: Townes Boyd Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Matthew E Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?