Donald A Gardner Inc v. Montgomery Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald A Gardner Inc
Defendant: IBI Builders LLC, Montgomery Holdings LLC, Gregory Grissinger, Jr and John Montgomery
Case Number: 6:2020cv01176
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 10/26/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/5/20. (kmca)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/26/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/9/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 6/9/2020, ADR Statement/Certification due by 6/9/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/20/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/19/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/18/2020, Discovery due by 10/19/2020, Motions due by 11/2/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 2/1/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/5/20. (kmca)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gregory Grissinger, Jr, IBI Builders LLC, John Montgomery, Montgomery Holdings LLC.(McMillan, Elizabeth)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gregory Grissinger, Jr, IBI Builders LLC, John Montgomery, Montgomery Holdings LLC.(McMillan, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald A Gardner Inc. Gregory Grissinger, Jr served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020; IBI Builders LLC served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020; John Montgomery served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020; Montgomery Holdings LLC served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #6 Report on the Filing of Copyright to Copyright Office at 508filings@loc.gov. (kmca)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (kmca)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gregory Grissinger, Jr, IBI Builders LLC, John Montgomery, Montgomery Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons IBI Builders LLC, #2 Summons John Montgomery, #3 Summons Greg Grissinger Jr)(kmca)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Donald A Gardner Inc.(kmca)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory Grissinger, Jr; IBI Builders LLC, John Montgomery, Montgomery Holdings LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9022168), filed by Donald A Gardner Inc. Service due by 6/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Elevations of Riverstone Home, #2 Exhibit 2 - Elevations of Lot 12 Home)(kmca) Modified on 3/26/2020: to add descriptions of exhibits as provided by filing user (kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald A Gardner Inc v. Montgomery Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBI Builders LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery Holdings LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Grissinger, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Montgomery
Represented By: Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A Gardner Inc
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?