Rochester v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Julian E Rochester
Defendant: B Stirling, A M Wilson, Beth Drake, H F Floyd, John Roberts, South Carolina Administrative Law Court, K F McDonald, South Carolina Court of Appeals, Warden Williams, R B Harwell, H D McMaster and South Carolina Supreme Court
Case Number: 6:2020cv01309
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Judgment, 7 Order Dismissing Case, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Julian E Rochester 171519 Perry Correctional Institution ALU 192 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669 (kric, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT dismissing the case without prejudice. (kric, )
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Mr. Rochester is a state prisoner whose long history of abusive and frivolous filing practices resulted in an Order of Pre-Filing Review. See Order of Pre-Filing Review, Doc. # 6, In Re: Julian Edward Rochester, Misc. No. 2:95-MC-131 (Jan. 29, 1996). On July 10, 2012, the Court further modified Mr. Rochester's Order of Pre-Filing Review to require that he pay the full statutory filing fee in any future non-habeas civil actions.To the extent Mr. Rochester has attempted to name the Undersigned as a party to this action, this Court has thoroughly addressed that issue in a previous order. See Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Doc. # 21, at 48, Rochester v. Laubshire et al., Civil Action No. 6:12-cv-00236 (July 10, 2012). As noted in that order, a judge may exercise discretion and refuse to recuse himself in proceedings where a litigant is abusing the judicial system, as is Mr. Rochester. This is especially true here, where Mr. Rochester has made no substantiated allegations against the judges of this Court, including the Undersigned. It appears that Mr. Rochester, who has named nearly every judge in this district as a party in his various cases, is doing nothing more than attempting to add judges as parties in order to push for judicial recusal and extend the life span of his cases.In a recent order filed in this case, the magistrate judge directed Mr. Rochester to pay the statutory filing fee within twenty-one (21) days. The magistrate judge also apprised Mr. Rochester that this Court would dismiss this case if he failed to pay the statutory filing fee within the time period specified in the order. Mr. Rochester has failed to pay the statutory filing fee within the twenty-one-day period. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-captioned case is DISMISSED without prejudice and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court shall close the file. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 5/6/2020. (kric, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Julian E Rochester 171519 Perry Correctional Institution ALU192 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669 (kric, )
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 4/30/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/9/20. (ctuc, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (kric, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Julian E Rochester. Service due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochester v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H F Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Administrative Law Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K F McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R B Harwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H D McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian E Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?