Lovelace et al v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Protection and Advocacy for the People with Disabilities Inc, John and Jane Does 1-10, Brandon Lee Lovelace and Austin Scott Turner
Defendant: Chuck Wright and Allen Freeman
Case Number: 6:2020cv01977
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class by John and Jane Does 1-10, Brandon Lee Lovelace, Protection and Advocacy for the People with Disabilities Inc, Austin Scott Turner. Response to Motion due by 6/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A- Declaration of Katherine Weaver Patterson, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of Susan Dunn, #4 Exhibit C- Declaration of Adam Protheroe, #5 Exhibit D- Declaration of Rita Bolt Barker, #6 Exhibit E- Declaration of James E. Cox, Jr.)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Barker, Rita)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John and Jane Does 1-10, Brandon Lee Lovelace, Protection and Advocacy for the People with Disabilities Inc, Austin Scott Turner. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- Trial Courts Order, as amended April 22, 2020, #3 Exhibit 2- Order regarding the use of face coverings and masks due to COVID-19, #4 Exhibit 3- Summary Court Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 4- Administrative Order 2020-04-20-01, #6 Exhibit 5- Administrative Order 2020-05-07-02, #7 Exhibit 6- ACLU letter dated March 18, 2020, #8 Exhibit 7- Root and Rebound MArch 26, 2020 letter to Jail Administrators, #9 Exhibit 8- Letter to Jail Administrators dated April 16, 2020)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Barker, Rita)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allen Freeman, Chuck Wright. (Attachments: #1 Wright Summons)(kric, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John and Jane Does 1-10, Brandon Lee Lovelace, Protection and Advocacy for the People with Disabilities Inc, Austin Scott Turner.(kric, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allen Freeman, Chuck Wright ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-0116620.), filed by John and Jane Does 1-10, Brandon Lee Lovelace, Austin Scott Turner, Protection and Advocacy for the People with Disabilities Inc. Service due by 8/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anna Maria Conner, #2 Declaratio of Bridget Brown regarding Gray-Nash, #3 Declaration of Bridget Brown Regarding Lovelace, #4 Declaratio of Bridget Brown Regarding Turner, #5 Declaratio nof Dr Johnathan Louis Golob, #6 Declaration of Franklin Garner, #7 Declaratio nof Katherine Weaver Patterson, #8 Declaration of Melissa Nolan PhD, MPH, #9 Declaratio of Dr Jamie Meyer)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovelace et al v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protection and Advocacy for the People with Disabilities Inc
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Bridget Brown
Represented By: Katherine Weaver Patterson
Represented By: James Edward Cox, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Jane Does 1-10
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Bridget Brown
Represented By: Katherine Weaver Patterson
Represented By: James Edward Cox, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lee Lovelace
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Bridget Brown
Represented By: Katherine Weaver Patterson
Represented By: James Edward Cox, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Scott Turner
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Represented By: Adam Protheroe
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Bridget Brown
Represented By: Katherine Weaver Patterson
Represented By: James Edward Cox, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?