Ashmore v. Swerdlow et al
Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Defendant: Anchor Financial Inc and Brian Swerdlow
Case Number: 6:2020cv02643
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beattie B Ashmore re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Brian Swerdlow and Anchor Financial, Inc. , 8 Clerk's Entry of Default, #7 Request for Entry of Default (Tollison, Lewis)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Brian Swerdlow and Anchor Financial, Inc. by Beattie B Ashmore. Response to Motion due by 9/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/8/2020: see #10 Certificate of Service (kmca).
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Anchor Financial Inc, Brian Swerdlow (alew, ) Modified on 9/8/2020: see #10 Certificate of Service (kmca).
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byBeattie B Ashmore. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default)(Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/8/2020: see #10 Certificate of Service (kmca).
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beattie B Ashmore. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Proof of Service - Swerdlow, #2 Main Document Proof of Service - Anchor Financial)(Tollison, Lewis)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anchor Financial Inc, Brian Swerdlow. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jeffrey Michael Gunderson, Registered Agent for Anchor Financial, Inc.)(alew, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Beattie B Ashmore.(alew, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anchor Financial Inc, Brian Swerdlow ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9222712.), filed by Beattie B Ashmore. Service due by 10/14/2020(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashmore v. Swerdlow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Financial Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Swerdlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Represented By: Lewis Walter Tollison, III
Represented By: Thomas Edward Vanderbloemen
Represented By: Lauren S Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?