Delta Apparel Inc v. HanesBrands Inc
Plaintiff: Delta Apparel Inc
Defendant: HanesBrands Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv03418
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/4/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/31/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/1/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/22/2021, Discovery due by 8/19/2021, Motion in Limine due by 10/18/2021, Motions due by 9/3/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/28/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 11/15/2021, Mediation Due by 9/17/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 11/20/20. (alew, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Confidentiality Order; Confidentiality Order as set out. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 11/20/20.(alew, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by HanesBrands Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Confidentiality Order (Clean))Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey) Modified on 11/20/2020 to delete duplicate text (alew, ).
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry: phone conference held with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. The parties are directed to submit responses to Local Civil Rule (D.S.C.) 26.03 interrogatories within 14 days. (alew, )
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Wednesday, 11/18/2020 09:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1021/20. (alew, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/4/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/29/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/1/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/22/2021, Discovery due by 4/19/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/18/2021, Motions due by 5/3/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/28/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/19/2021, Mediation Due by 5/17/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/21/20. (alew, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Delta Apparel Inc.(Ellis, Bernie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by HanesBrands Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories within 14 days after removal (10/9/20). (alew, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by HanesBrands Inc.(alew, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-23-03986. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9367664), filed by HanesBrands Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Apparel Inc v. HanesBrands Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HanesBrands Inc
Represented By: Luke Montgomery Allen
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Represented By: John Fisher Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Apparel Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Represented By: Celeste Tiller Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?