Golden v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Larry Golden
Defendant: General Motors Company, Verizon Corporation Service Group, Motorola Solutions Inc, LG Electronics, USA, Inc, Apple Inc., Fairway Ford Lincoln of Greenville, Ford Global Technologies LLC, AT&T Inc, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Big O Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram, Qualcomm Inc, Panasonic Corporation, FCA US LLC, Sprint Corporation, Samsung Electronics USA and Kevin Whitaker Chevrolet
Case Number: 6:2020cv04353
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
2 Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 23 OBJECTION to #20 Report and Recommendation by Larry Golden. Reply to Objections due by 2/25/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Pictures of Evidence, LG V30, LG G6, Samsung S8, Apple iPhone 7, Apple iPhone 8, #2 Exhibit B- Patent Drawings (Evidence) Numbered Patent Drawings From Patent No. 10,163,287, #3 Exhibit C- (Previously Presented Evidence) Numbered Claim Chart Drawings of Apple iPhone 8, #4 Exhibit D- (Previously Presented Evidence) Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E- (Claim Chart Previously Submitted) Government Contract For Smartphones, #6 Envelope)(rweb, ) Modified on 2/11/2021 to edit text (rweb, ).
February 5, 2021 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #18 Order, #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Larry Golden, 19 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 21 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Golden 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607 (kric, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Joseph Dawson III. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: US District Court, 300 East Washington Street, Greenville, SC 29601. (kric, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Larry Golden. The Court recommends that the District Court dismiss this action with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. It is further recommends that the assigned United States District Judge sanction the petitioner $400.00, payable to the Clerk of Court at 300 East Washington Street,Greenville, SC 29601. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/5/2021. (kric, )
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as filing fee has been paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/5/2021.(kric, ) Modified on 2/5/2021 to edit text (kric, ).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Because the plaintiff has paid the full filing fee, his motion to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. 4) is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/5/2021. (kric, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 Letter from Larry Golden to Chief Judge Harwell regarding the relevancy of case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Notice Change of Case Number, 12 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Golden 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607 (kric, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER 6:20-cv-4353-JD-KFM has been changed to reflect the new District Judge's initials as this case has now been reassigned to the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III. (kric, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph Dawson, III. Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Larry Golden. Service due by 4/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Patent 10,163,287, #2 Exhibit B Patent 9,589,439, #3 Exhibit C Patent 9,096,189, #4 Exhibit D Patent RE43,990, #5 Exhibit E Patent RE43,891, #6 Exhibit F Patent7,385,497, #7 Envelope)(kric, ) Modified on 1/5/2021 to edit text (kric, ).
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS by Larry Golden to #1 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rweb, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #1 Proper Form Order, to Brian Shropshire and Margaret Nason in Columbia Clerk's Office with instructions to mail the proper form order with all complaint documents and exhibit attachments to Mr Golden at 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607. The proper form order was also mailed from Greenville with proper form documents. This mailing is only to return documents. The 26.01 interrogatories, the AO240 application and all service documents. Proposed summons and USM285 forms are to be taken out of the documents before mailing to Mr Golden and those documents sent via UPS to the Greenville Clerks Office as they have been filed in the case. (kric, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number SCX300091165 (kric, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #1 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Golden 740 Woodruff Road #1102 Greenville, SC 29607 with blank complaint form (kric, )
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. A request for recusal is denied. Directing the clerk to return only the complaint and exhibits to the plaintiff. Clerk is to keep the IFP application, LR26.01 interrogatories and the proposed service documents for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin F. McDonald on 12/17/2020. (kric, ) Modified on 12/17/2020 to edit signing judge. (kric, ).
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Larry Golden.(kric, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Larry Golden. Response to Motion due by 12/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Corporation Service Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Ford Lincoln of Greenville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Global Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big O Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Whitaker Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?