Greenwood Inc v. IES Commercial Inc
Counter Defendant: Greenwood Inc
3Rd Party Plaintiff: IES Commercial Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 6:2021cv02085
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IES Commercial Inc. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit A - SCDOI Acceptance)(Kelley, Bryan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim #8 by Greenwood Inc.(alew, ) Refiled by clerk to correct event type
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Greenwood, Inc. against IES Commercial Inc, filed by Greenwood Inc. Service due by 12/2/2021 (Dillard, William)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Tuesday, 9/28/21 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/25/21. (alew, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/14/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/8/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/3/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/3/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/24/2022, Discovery due by 2/22/2022, Motion in Limine due by 4/22/2022, Motions due by 3/7/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/2/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 5/23/2022, Mediation Due by 3/21/2022. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/25/21. (alew, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by IES Commercial Inc.(Kelley, Bryan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Third-Party Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (alew, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, COUNTERCLAIM against Greenwood Inc by IES Commercial Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Performance Bond)(Kelley, Bryan)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number #6 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 7/29/21 (alew, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greenwood Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons IES Issued and Served Summons on IES Commercial, Inc.'s Registered Agent CT Corporation with Confirmation of Service on July 23, 2021, #2 Supporting Documents Proof of Service on IES Commercial, Inc. of Summons by USPS Tracking System Delivery to Agent for Final Delivery Certified Mail Receipt by serving its Registered Agent-CT Corporation)(Dillard, William) Modified on 7/30/2021 to correct filing date (alew, ).
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to IES Commercial Inc. (alew, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Greenwood Inc.(alew, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IES Commercial Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9956682.), filed by Greenwood Inc. Service due by 10/12/2021(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwood Inc v. IES Commercial Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Greenwood Inc
Represented By: William Kyle Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: IES Commercial Inc
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?