Wheeler v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Wheeler and Andrew Tarell Wheeler
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections, Director Bryan Sterling, Warden Tonya James, Steven Holiness and Sgt Sally Crowe
Case Number: 6:2021cv03512
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Andrew Wheeler #364425 SA09 Kershaw Correction Institution 4848 Gold Mine Highway Kershaw, SC 29067 with financial certificate, summons and USM285 forms (kric, )
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/10/2021. (kric, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, AO 240, Financial Certificate, AO 440, 5 x USM-285 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Andrew Wheeler 364425 SA09 Kershaw Correction Institution 4848 Gold Mine Highway Kershaw, SC 29067 (sgri)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/12/2021. (sgri)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (rweb, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Andrew Wheeler. Response to Motion due by 11/10/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(rweb, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sally Crowe, Steven Holiness, Tonya James, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Bryan Sterling, filed by Andrew Wheeler. Service due by 1/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rweb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Tarell Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Bryan Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Tonya James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Holiness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Sally Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?