Blue World Pools Inc et al v. Roach et al
Petitioner: Blue World Pools Inc
Respondent: Sean Roach and Imprimis LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv03771
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation), Imprimis LLC, Sean Roach. (Harrill, Paul)
January 11, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Response filed by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation). (Harrill, Paul)
January 7, 2022 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY: Telephone Status Conference held with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr., regarding the posture of the case. The parties are directed to provide a joint status report by January 14, 2022, indicating whether the parties wish to engage in a period of negotiation prior to the Courts ruling on the pending Motion, and if so, how much time the parties require for that purpose. (alew, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 , #18 motions for extension of time. Respondent's response to the motion to compel arbitration, filed December 30, 2021, will be considered timely filed. Petitioner's reply to response to motion is due by January 11, 2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/5/22.(alew)
January 5, 2022 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Motion to Compel Arbitration by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation). Response to Motion due by 1/19/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Harrill, Paul) Modified on 1/5/2022 to correct linkage (alew, ).
January 5, 2022 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #4 Motion to Compel Arbitration by Sean Roach, Imprimis LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/19/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Rosado, Sybil) Modified on 1/5/2022 to correct motion relief, to add linkage, to add party listed as filer (alew, ).
January 4, 2022 Filing 16 Sealed Document in re document #4 . (Harrill, Paul)
January 4, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for Friday, 1/7/2022 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Respondents' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. (alew, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #8 motion to file under seal certain exhibits to the pending motion to compel arbitration #4 . Upon review, the undersigned hereby finds that the petitioners have fully complied with the procedure required by Local Civil Rule 5.03 (D.S.C.), and the factors set forth in Ashcroft v. Conoco, Inc., 218 F.3d 288, 302 (4th Cir. 2000), and In re Knight Publishing Co., 743 F.2d 231, 235 (4th Cir. 1984), favor sealing. Accordingly, the motion to file under seal is granted. The petitioners are directed to file the exhibits under seal. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/3/22.(rweb, )
December 30, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Compel Response filed by Imprimis LLC, Sean Roach.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/6/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (alew, ) Modified on 1/4/2022 to correct event, to modify document number(alew, ).
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time and denying #10 motion to strike. Defendants response to the motion to compel arbitration is due by December 28, 2021. The Court notes its concern with the recriminations contained throughout these filings. Counsel is reminded of their professional duty to conduct themselves in a civil manner. Vituperative and conclusory allegations regarding opposing counsels motives and conduct will not be tolerated going forward. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/13/21.(alew, )
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION to Strike Response filed by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation).Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/17/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12-10-21 Letter from Dunsmoor (redacted to remove third party name))(Harrill, Paul)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Response to Motion due by 12/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Imprimis LLC, Sean Roach. No proposed order.(Rosado, Sybil). Added MOTION to Strike on 12/10/2021 (alew, ) modified by clerk to add motion relief
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sybil D Rosado on behalf of Imprimis LLC, Sean Roach (Rosado, Sybil)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Seal by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation). Response to Motion due by 12/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Documents to be Filed Under Seal per LR 5.03(B))No proposed order.(Harrill, Paul)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation) re: service to Imprimis LLC of Summons and Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Harrill, Paul) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/2/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 12/2/2021 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user, to edit text (alew, ).
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation) re: service to Sean Roach of Summons and Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Harrill, Paul) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/2/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 12/2/2021 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user, to edit text (alew, ).
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Imprimis LLC, Sean Roach. (Attachments: #1 Summons Imprimis LLC)(alew, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation). Response to Motion due by 12/1/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(alew, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation).(alew, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION as to Imprimis LLC, Sean Roach ( Filing fee $ 402. Receipt number ASCDC-10193372.), filed by Blue World Pools Inc(a Nevada corporation), Blue World Pools Inc(a Georgia corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Arbitration Agreement)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue World Pools Inc et al v. Roach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blue World Pools Inc
Represented By: Paul D Harrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sean Roach
Represented By: Sybil D Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Imprimis LLC
Represented By: Sybil D Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?