Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sallyann Sullivan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record and US Attorney - Social Security Noticing
Case Number: 6:2022cv03878
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 18 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Sallyann Sullivan 854 Issaqueena Trail #202 Central, SC 29630 (arut)
December 29, 2022 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 the Commissioner's unopposed motion for extension of time until March 6, 2023, to file the certified administrative record or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/29/22.(arut)
December 29, 2022 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Response to Motion due by 1/12/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Leach, David)
December 5, 2022 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Proper Form Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Sallyann Sullivan 854 Issaqueena Trail #202 Central, SC 29630 (arut)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPER FORM ORDER. Case to be brought into proper form by 12/15/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/5/22. (arut)
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint - Social Security,. First attachment description: Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arut)
November 7, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/7/22.(arut)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order, #1 Complaint - Social Security, 10 Text Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Sallyann Sullivan 854 Issaqueena Trail #202 Central, SC 29630. (arut) Modified on 11/8/2022 to add 10 text order enclosed in same envelope for mailing (arut).
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER. Case to be brought into proper form by 11/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/7/22. (arut)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 6 Order and Form AO85 placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Sallyann Sullivan 854 Issaqueena Trail #202 Central, SC 29630 (arut)
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Social Security Appeals Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website.* Not later than thirty days from the entry of this Text Order, Plaintiff shall file a (1) signed and completed Notice, Consent, and Reference of the Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, or (2) status report informing the Court Plaintiff withholds consent to disposition of Plaintiff's appeal by a United States Magistrate Judge. IT IS SO ORDERED. https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing_Order_Regarding_Social_Security_Cases.pdf (Status Report due by 12/7/2022.) Entered at the direction of Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/07/2022.(arut)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.02, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due from Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 3/6/2023 (arut)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Sallyann Sullivan. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(arut) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2022: #1 Envelope) (arut).
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.03 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Sallyann Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(arut) Modified on 11/17/2022 Additional Attachment filed as separate entry #11 on 11/17/22. (arut). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/12/2022 with corrected document per chambers) (arut).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sallyann Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: David Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Attorney - Social Security Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?