Slick Slide LLC v. Pelletier
Plaintiff: Slick Slide LLC
Defendant: Dustin Pelletier
Case Number: 6:2023cv03924
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #10 Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application for Brett A. Schatz. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 10/3/2023. (lgib, )
October 2, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Dustin Pelletier. (Williams, Tim)
September 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett A. Schatz ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11343866) by Slick Slide LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/11/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hudson, Joshua)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In light of #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed, #6 Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint is terminated as moot. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 9/26/2023. (lgib, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Slick Slide LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/2/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hudson, Joshua)
September 11, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dustin Pelletier. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Williams, Tim)
September 7, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dustin Pelletier. Response to Motion due by 9/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Williams, Tim)
August 10, 2023 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lgib, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dustin Pelletier. Service due by 11/8/2023. (lgib, )
August 9, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Slick Slide LLC. (lgib, )
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dustin Pelletier (filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-11256995), filed by Slick Slide LLC. Service due by 11/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 821 patent is attached to this Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Pictures) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slick Slide LLC v. Pelletier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slick Slide LLC
Represented By: Joshua Jennings Hudson
Represented By: Brett A Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Pelletier
Represented By: Tim F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?