PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. v. TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.
Plaintiff: PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.
Defendant: Tietex International Ltd
Interested Party: ROYAL ADHESIVES AND SEALANTS, LLC.
Case Number: 7:2017cv03037
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Spartanburg Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Thomas D Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 405 USCA MANDATE and JUDGMENT as to #394 Notice of Appeal, filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.; Affirmed (Attachments: #1 JUDGMENT)(alew, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 404 DECLARATION by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.re #403 Costs Taxed of Payment Made in Full. (Flynn, Stephanie)
May 31, 2019 Filing 403 Costs Taxed in amount of $ $17,380.92 against Precision Fabrics Group, Inc. (fbos, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER re #385 Bill of Costs, filed by Tietex International Ltd Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 5/31/19. (fbos, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 401 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Pretrial Motions for dates of 2/23/18, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder, re #394 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen E. Martin, Telephone number/e-mail Karen_E_Martin@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? Y Redaction Request due 6/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2019. (kmartin, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 400 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/27/17, before Judge Thomas D Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Briana Bell, Telephone number/E-mail 336-734-2514/brinesbit@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2019. (alew, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 399 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 3/1/18, before Judge Thomas D Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Briana Bell, Telephone number/E-mail 336-734-2514/ brinesbit@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2019. (alew, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 397 REPLY by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. to #391 Reply by Tietex International to Objections of PFG to Bill of Costs. (Flynn, Stephanie)
April 9, 2019 Filing 396 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #383 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for New Trial, #394 Notice of Appeal, #384 Judgment, Certified Docket Sheet to Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (alew, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 395 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 395 Reason: clerk error (alew, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 394 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #383 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for New Trial, #384 Judgment by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. - Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0420-8372753. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Flynn, Stephanie)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting #389 Motion to Substitute Attorney as set out. Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 4/5/19.(alew, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 391 REPLY by Tietex International Ltd to #388 Objections of PFG to Bill of Costs. (Brown, William)
April 5, 2019 Filing 390 RESPONSE in Support re #389 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Response filed by Tietex International Ltd. (Brown, William)
April 4, 2019 Filing 389 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Flynn, Stephanie)
April 2, 2019 Filing 388 OBJECTIONS by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. to #385 Bill of Costs. Refiled by clerk to correct event type. (alew, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 386 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (Flynn, Stephanie) (Main Document 386 replaced on 4/2/2019) (alew, ). Modified on 4/2/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ).
March 19, 2019 Filing 385 BILL OF COSTS by Tietex International Ltd.Objections to Bill of Costs deadline 4/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion-Trial Transcripts Fees, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition-Video Fees, #3 Exhibit C - Trial Exhibit Printing Fees, #4 Exhibit D - Expert Travel Expense, #5 Exhibit E - Court Fees)(Brown, William)
March 8, 2019 Filing 384 JUDGMENT in favor of Tietex International Ltd against PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (alew, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 383 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #372 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying #372 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 3/8/19.(alew, )
May 14, 2018 Filing 380 REPLY to Response to Motion re #372 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Re: Motion for New Trial) Response filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Rozelsky, Kurt) Modified on 5/15/2018 to edit text (alew, ).
May 14, 2018 Filing 379 REPLY to Response to Motion re #372 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Re: Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law) Response filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Rozelsky, Kurt) Modified on 5/15/2018 to edit text (alew, ).
May 2, 2018 Filing 377 RESPONSE in Opposition re #372 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Opposition to New Trial) Response filed by Tietex International Ltd. Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/14/2018 (Per court-imposed deadline 10 days after the filing of the Response) Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2.23.18 Hearing Transcript Excerpt, #2 Exhibit B Horrocks Supplemental Report Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C Pl. Ex. 64)(Outten, Samuel) Modified on 5/4/2018 (sfla).
May 2, 2018 Filing 376 RESPONSE in Opposition re #372 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Opposition to Judgment for Matter of Law only) Response filed by Tietex International Ltd. Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/14/2018 (Per Court-imposed deadline 10 days after the filing of the Response) Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Outten, Samuel) Modified on 5/4/2018 to correct Reply deadline. (sfla).
April 6, 2018 Filing 373 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PFG'S #372 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Response to Motion and memorandum due within 30 days of motion filing per order #359 ; replies to responses due within 10 days. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certified Trial Transcripts, #2 Exhibit B Excerpts of Certified Trial Transcripts - Visible, #3 Exhibit C Excerpts of Certified Trial Transcripts - Significant swelling, #4 Exhibit D Excerpts of Certified Trial Transcripts - Carbon, #5 Exhibit E Excerpts of Certified Trial Transcripts - Thermal barrier, #6 Exhibit F Excerpts of Certified Trial Transcripts - Thickness, #7 Exhibit G Excerpts of Certified Trial Transcripts - Heavy Char, #8 Exhibit H Excerpts of Dr. Horrocks 11-11-2015 Deposition, #9 Exhibit I PTX345 - TABLE FROM PG 13 OF HORROCKS REPORT, #10 Exhibit J PTX64)No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt) Modified on 4/9/2018 to edit text (ncha, ).
April 6, 2018 Filing 372 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and PFG's Alternative Motion for a New Trial by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 5/7/2018. Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rozelsky, Kurt). Added MOTION for New Trial on 4/9/2018: to add additional relief listed on document (kmca). Modified on 4/10/2018 to correct response deadlines per order filed 3/21/18 (alew, ).
March 23, 2018 Filing 370 REPLY to Response to Motion re #345 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Response filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
March 23, 2018 Filing 369 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Jury Trial held on 3/9/18, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen E. Martin, Telephone number/E-mail 864-201-8411, Karen_E_Martin@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the court reporter or through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (kmartin)
March 23, 2018 Filing 368 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Jury Trial held on 3/8/18, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen E. Martin, Telephone number/E-mail 864-201-8411, Karen_E_Martin@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the court reporter or through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (kmartin)
March 23, 2018 Filing 367 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Jury Trial held on 3/7/18, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen E. Martin, Telephone number/E-mail 864-201-8411, Karen_E_Martin@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the court reporter or through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (kmartin)
March 23, 2018 Filing 366 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Jury Trial held on 3/6/18, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen E. Martin, Telephone number/E-mail 864-201-8411, Karen_E_Martin@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the court reporter or through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (kmartin)
March 23, 2018 Filing 365 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Jury Trial held on 3/5/18, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen E. Martin, Telephone number/E-mail 864-201-8411, Karen_E_Martin@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the court reporter or through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (kmartin)
March 21, 2018 Filing 363 TEXT ORDER issued by Honorable Thomas D. Schroeder on 3/21/2018 GRANTING #362 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Schroeder, Thomas)
March 21, 2018 Filing 362 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tietex International Ltd. Response to Motion due by 4/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Brown, William)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Order to Vacate #354 Judgment, SCHEDULING ORDER (post-trial motions pursuant to Rule 50 or Rule 59 due by 4/6/2018, responses must be filed within 30 days of filing of motion) signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 3/21/2018. (ncha, )
March 19, 2018 Filing 358 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER in Winston-Salem, NC. Telephone Conference held on 3/19/2018 to discuss post- trial matters. Attorneys Richard Coughlin, Lynne Borchers, Whit Pierce, and Kurt Rozelsky participated on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Giles Schanen, Jr., Neil Jones, William Brown and Sam Outten participated on behalf of Defendant. Written order forthcoming. Court Reporter Briana Bell. Case Manager Anita Engle. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037, 7:17-cv-03038. (fbos, )
March 19, 2018 Filing 357 RESPONSE in Opposition re #345 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Response filed by Tietex International Ltd.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/26/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Brown, William)
March 15, 2018 Filing 355 NOTICE of Hearing: NOTICE of Hearing: Electronic Notice to Counsel on 3/15/2018. Telephone Conference on post-trial matters set for 3/19/2018 at 05:00 PM before Honorable Judge Thomas D Schroeder. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS (fbos, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 354 JUDGMENT in favor of Tietex International Ltd against PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 353 COURT EXHIBIT. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER RETURNING EXHIBITS signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 3/09/2018. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 350 JURY VERDICT. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 349 Exhibit List. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 348 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: Jury Trial completed on 3/9/2018. Court Reporter Karen Martin. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 347 Jury Instructions Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 345 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 3/23/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt)
March 8, 2018 Filing 344 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: Jury Trial held on 3/8/2018. Continued to tomorrow morning at 8:15AM. Court Reporter Karen Martin. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 7, 2018 Filing 342 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: Jury Trial held on 3/7/2018. Continued to tomorrow morning at 8:30AM. Court Reporter Karen Martin. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 341 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: Jury Trial held on 3/6/2018. Continued to tomorrow morning at 8:30AM. Court Reporter Karen Martin. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 340 ORAL ORDER unsealing #332 Order regarding parties' motions in limine entered by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 3/6/2018. (ncha, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 339 Jury List. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 338 Panel Strike List. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 337 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 3/5/2018. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 336 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: Jury Trial held on 3/5/2018. Continue to tomorrow morning at 8:45AM. Court Reporter Karen Martin. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 335 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: Jury Selection held on 3/5/2018. Eight jurors seated. Court Reporter Karen Martin. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(ncha, )
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Number 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling (Doc. 220) and Plaintiff's Motion In Limine Number 6 (Regarding the In-applicability of the 'Person of Ordinary skill in the Art' Standard) (Doc. 222), to the extent addressed herein, are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: To the extent PFG's motions seek to preclude testimony from one of ordinary skill in the art as to the issue of literal infringement, they are DENIED; to the extent PFG's motions seek to preclude testimony as one of ordinary skill in the art as to whether SVX41 swells, it is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as noted herein. Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 3/5/18. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(kmca) (Main Document 333 replaced on 3/6/2018) (abuc, ).
March 5, 2018 Filing 332 SEALED ORDER re parties' motions in limine. Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 3/5/18. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(kmca) (Main Document 332 replaced on 3/6/2018) (abuc, ). Modified on 3/6/2018 to unseal per Judge's order (ncha, ).
March 3, 2018 Filing 331 Text order issued by Honorable Thomas D. Schroeder on 3/3/2018. The court intends to issue written decisions on the following pending motions as time permits, but to provide the parties notice for the upcoming trial indicates the following rulings: Tietexs Motion in Limine No. 2 Doc. #207 regarding the opinions of Joel Wacek: the motion is granted in part and denied in part: it is denied to the extent it seeks to preclude Wacek from testifying as to his opinion attributing 90% of Tietexs C242 sales to PFG, it is denied to the extent it seeks to preclude him from testifying that any assumptions for his opinions are conservative provided such testimony is supported by an adequate foundation, and it is granted to the extent it seeks to preclude his opinion attributing 100% of Tietexs sales to PFG absent other proper foundation not demonstrated in the briefing. PFGs Motion in Limine No. 4 Doc. #215 regarding the opinions of Charles Alford, Ph.D.: The motion is denied as to his opinion as to Waceks opinion regarding the existence of a two-supplier market. The court reserves ruling on the remainder of the motion insofar as it is predicated on the testimony of and assumptions by Wacek. The court will consider the unresolved portion of the motion following the conclusion of Waceks testimony. PFGs Motion in Limine No. 6 Doc. #222 regarding the admissibility of testimony of one of ordinary skill in the art on the issue of literal infringement: the motion, predicated on the assertion that the perspective of one of ordinary skill in the art is inadmissible as to a claim of literal infringement, is denied. PFGs Motion in Limine No. 5 Doc. #220 regarding the issue whether Tietexs expert witness, Richard Horrocks, Ph.D., may offer an opinion as one of ordinary skill in the art as to whether SV-X41 swells (the question reserved in the court's prior memorandum opinion Doc. #318 at 38 n.17 is granted in part and denied in part. To the extent the motion seeks to preclude Dr. Horrocks from testifying as one of ordinary skill in the art as to whether SV-X41 swells within the meaning of the courts claim construction, it is denied. However, to the extent the motion seeks to preclude testimony of one of ordinary skill in the art that any swelling observed is not sufficient to be an intumescent because it does not swell to a sufficient degree to act as a thermal barrier to lessen the effects of heat or flame on the underlying fabric is granted. Decision as to PFGs Motion in Limine No. 8 Doc. #226 as to the testimony of Messrs. Freeman and Klancnik forthcoming. SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 3/3/2018. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(Schroeder, Thomas) Modified on 3/5/2018 to create linkage, to edit text (alew, ). Modified on 3/5/2018 (alew, ).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER denying #319 Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat in case 7:17-cv-03037-TDS; denying #289 Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat in case 7:17-cv-03038-TDS Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 03/02/2018.Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(Schroeder, Thomas) Modified on 3/5/2018 to create linkage (alew, ).
March 2, 2018 Filing 329 TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental Pre-Trial Brief re Lay Witness Testimony by Tietex International Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Statement from PFG)(Brown, William)
March 1, 2018 Filing 327 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder in Winston-Salem, NC. Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2018 to discuss pending pretrial matters. Attorneys Richard Coughlin, Lynne Borchers, Whitney Pierce and Kurt Rozelsky participated on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Giles Schanen, Jr., William Brown, and Sam Outten participated on behalf of Defendant. Court GRANTS the parties agreed-upon strikes for cause of potential jurors. Defendants Supplemental Trial Brief as discussed during the conference is due by close of business on 3/2/2018. Trial to begin with counsel at 9:00 a.m. on 3/5/2018. Jury Selection to begin at 9:30 a.m. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: Court Reporter Briana Bell. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(alew, )
February 28, 2018 Filing 326 REPLY to Response to Motion re #319 MOTION Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat Response filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
February 28, 2018 Filing 325 RESPONSE in Opposition re #319 MOTION Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat Response filed by Tietex International Ltd.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/7/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Excerpts 2017.06.19 Dep of Gajanan Bhat)(Outten, Samuel)
February 27, 2018 Filing 324 Proposed Jury Instructions by Tietex International Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2018.02.27 JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM)(Outten, Samuel) (Main Document 324 replaced on 2/28/2018) (alew, ). Modified on 2/28/2018 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ).
February 27, 2018 Filing 323 NOTICE of Hearing: Electronic Notice to Counsel on 2/27/2018. Telephone Conference on pending pretrial matters set for 3/1/2018 03:00 PM before Honorable Judge Thomas D Schroeder. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(alew, )
February 27, 2018 Filing 321 TEXT ORDER issued by Honorable Thomas D. Schroeder on 2/27/2018 GRANTING PFG's Motion to Expedite ( #320 in 7:17cv3037 and 290 in 7:17cv3038). IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Tietex shall file any response to PFG's Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat ( #319 in 7:17cv3037 and #289 in 7:17cv3038) no later than 12:00 noon on February 28, 2018. Associated Cases: 7:17cv3037, 7:17cv3038(Schroeder, Thomas)
February 26, 2018 Filing 320 MOTION to Expedite (for Expedited Consideration of Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 3/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt)
February 26, 2018 Filing 319 MOTION Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 3/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Supplemental Expert Report of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D.)No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt) Modified on 2/27/2018 to add exhibit descriptions provided by filing user (alew, ).
February 25, 2018 Filing 318 MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Honorable Thomas D. Schroeder on 2/25/2018. As set forth herein, the parties motions in limine (183) Motion in Limine; (185) Motion in Limine; (205) Motion in Limine; (209) Motion in Limine; (213) Motion in Limine; (220) Motion in Limine; (222) Motion in Limine; (224) Motion in Limine; and (228) Motion to Strike in case 7:17cv3037; and (153) Motion in Limine; (155) Motion in Limine; (175) Motion in Limine; (179) Motion in Limine; (183) Motion in Limine; (190) Motion in Limine; (192) Motion in Limine; (194) Motion in Limine; (198) Motion to Strike in case 7:17cv3038 are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Any motion not specifically resolved, in whole or in part, in this opinion or during the hearing will be addressed shortly in a separate order. The parties are directed to instruct their witnesses in conformance with this court's order. Associated Cases: 7:17cv3037, 7:17cv3038(Schroeder, Thomas)
February 23, 2018 Filing 322 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: taking under advisement (207) Motion in Limine; taking under advisement (215) Motion in Limine; taking under advisement (226) Motion in Limine in case 7:17-cv-03037-TDS; taking under advisement (177) Motion in Limine; taking under advisement (185) Motion in Limine; taking under advisement (196) Motion in Limine in case 7:17-cv-03038-TDS; Motion Hearing held on 2/23/2018 re (198 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION to Strike (160) Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Regarding Exhibit J filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (185 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (153 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (196 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 8 (Omnibus Motion in Limine) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (179 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Prior Court and IPR Proceedings) filed by Tietex International Ltd, (190 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (194 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 7 (To Limit Evidence Related to the Doctrine of Equivalents) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (183 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Dr. Horrocks's Aluminum Opinion) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (192 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Regarding the Inapplicbility of the "Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art" Standard) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (175 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (to exclude Opinion Testimony of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D. filed by Tietex International Ltd, (155 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (177 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Joel Wacek filed by Tietex International Ltd in case 7:17-cv-03037-TDS. Court Reporter Karen Martin. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(fbos, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 317 TEXT ORDER issued by the HONORABLE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 2/23/2018. On February 23, 2018, at the pretrial conference and hearing held on motions in limine, the court considered all pretrial motions and issued rulings as stated from the bench and took the remainder under advisement. A written order is forthcoming. The Parties' deadline for joint jury instructions is extended to 5:00 P.M. on Tuesday, February 27, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 7:17cv3037, 7:17cv3038(Schroeder, Thomas)
February 19, 2018 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel W Outten on behalf of Tietex International Ltd (Outten, Samuel)
February 15, 2018 Filing 315 TEXT ORDER issued by Honorable Thomas D. Schroeder on 2/15/2018. In light of the setting of the Hearing on all pending motions and Pretrial Conference set for February 23, 2018, Joint Jury Instructions and Verdict Form, taking into account the Court's rulings, shall be filed and submitted to the court by email to Jschroeder@ncmd.uscourts.gov in MS Word format no later than February 27, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 7:17cv3037, 7:17cv3038(Schroeder, Thomas)
February 12, 2018 Filing 314 TEXT ORDER issued by Honorable Thomas D. Schroeder on 2/12/2018 GRANTING PFG's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply ( #264 in 7:17CV3037 and #234 in 7:17CV3038). The motion is granted and the court will consider PFG's Sur-Reply in support of Motion in Limine No. 2 ( #312 in 7:17CV3037 and #282 in 7:17CV3038). No further briefing is authorized. IT IS SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(Schroeder, Thomas)
February 8, 2018 Filing 313 NOTICE of Hearing on all Pending Motions and Pretrial Conference re: (224 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 7 (To Limit Evidence Related to the Doctrine of Equivalents), (209 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Prior Court and IPR Proceedings), (213 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Dr. Horrocks's Aluminum Opinion), (226 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 8 (Omnibus Motion in Limine), (228 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION to Strike (190) Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Regarding Exhibit J, (205 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (to exclude Opinion Testimony of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D., (185 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production), (222 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Regarding the Inapplicbility of the "Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art" Standard), (220 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling, (215 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford), (183 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives), (207 in 7:17-cv-03037-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Joel Wacek, (185 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford), (192 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Regarding the Inapplicbility of the "Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art" Standard), (179 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Prior Court and IPR Proceedings), (175 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (to exclude Opinion Testimony of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D., (196 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 8 (Omnibus Motion in Limine), (198 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION to Strike (160) Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Regarding Exhibit J, (153 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives), (194 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 7 (To Limit Evidence Related to the Doctrine of Equivalents), (190 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling, (188 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION to Seal regarding Motion in Limine No. 4 [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4, (183 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Dr. Horrocks's Aluminum Opinion), (177 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Joel Wacek, (155 in 7:17-cv-03038-TDS) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) : Motion Hearing set for Friday, 2/23/2018 11:00 AM in Spartanburg 2nd Floor, Donald S Russell Fed Bldg, 201 Magnolia St, Spartanburg before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(alew, )
January 3, 2018 Filing 312 SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #185 MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) Response filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
January 3, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for Monday, 3/5/2018 09:30 AM in Spartanburg 2nd Floor, Donald S Russell Fed Bldg, 201 Magnolia St, Spartanburg before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2018 to begin immediately following Jury Selection and continue through Friday, 3/9/2018, beginning each day @ 9:30 AM in Spartanburg 2nd Floor, Donald S Russell Fed Bldg, 201 Magnolia St, Spartanburg before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(alew, )
December 22, 2017 Filing 310 TEXT ORDER issued by Honorable Thomas D. Schroeder on 12/22/2017 GRANTING PFG's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply ( #203 in 7:17CV3037 and #173 in 7:17CV3038). The motion is granted to the extent the Court decides to consider Tietex's Notice Regarding PFG's Motion in Limine No. 2 ( #203 in 7:17CV3037 and #173 in 7:17CV3038.) IT IS SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 7:17CV3037, 7:17CV3038(Schroeder, Thomas)
December 11, 2017 Filing 309 OBJECTIONS by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. to #307 Pretrial Disclosures. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
December 5, 2017 Filing 308 TEXT ORDER granting #305 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #306 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lynne A. Borchers and Peter Siddoway for Precision Fabrics Group Inc. Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 12/5/17.(alew, )
December 4, 2017 Filing 307 RULE 26(a)(3)PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Tietex International Ltd. Objections to PreTrial Disclosures due by 12/18/2017.(Brown, William)
December 1, 2017 Filing 306 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Daniel Siddoway ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7491237) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for PHV Admission)No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt)
December 1, 2017 Filing 305 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lynne A. Borchers ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7491230) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for PHV Admission)No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt)
November 29, 2017 Filing 304 TEXT ORDER granting #302 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #303 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard Coughlin and Whitney Pierce for Precision Fabrics Group Inc. Signed by Honorable Thomas D Schroeder on 11/29/17.(alew, )
November 28, 2017 Filing 303 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Whitney Demain Pierce ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7481551) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for PHV Admission)No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt)
November 28, 2017 Filing 302 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Andrew Coughlin ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7481514) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for PHV Admission)No proposed order.(Rozelsky, Kurt)
November 27, 2017 Filing 301 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER in Winston-Salem, NC. Telephone Conference held on 11/27/2017 to discuss trial date and other pending pretrial matters. Attorneys Richard Coughlin, Lynne Borchers and Kurt Rozelsky participated on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys James Robertson, Neil Jones, Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr. and William Brown participated on behalf of Defendant. Parties should anticipate 15 hours of trial time per side. Defendant moves to amend deposition designations for the North Carolina State University witnesses who are now outside the subpoena power of the court in South Carolina. Defendant's motion is GRANTED and Defendant is to file amended deposition designations by 12/4/2017. Plaintiff's objections and counter-designations are due by 12/11/2017. Parties are to report the status of any potential settlement discussions as directed by the Court. As discussed at the conference, trial date will be forthcoming. Proceedings held before Honorable Thomas D Schroeder: Court Reporter Briana Bell.Case Manager Anita Engle Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-03037-TDS, 7:17-cv-03038-TDS(alew, )
November 21, 2017 Filing 300 NOTICE of Hearing:Electronic Notice to Counsel on 11/21/2017. Telephone Conference to set a trial date and discuss any other pending pretrial matters set for November 27, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 7:17CV3037, 7:17CV3038 (fbos, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 299 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC..(Rozelsky, Kurt)
November 17, 2017 Filing 297 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tietex International Ltd.(Brown, William)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/16/2017. Parties are advised that this matter will be set for a telephonic hearing on a date to be determined after November 27, 2017, in order to set a trial date and discuss any other pending pretrial matters. SO ORDERED.(Schroeder, Thomas)
November 16, 2017 Filing 295 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas D Schroeder. Judge J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. (suro)
November 13, 2017 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Matthew Rozelsky on behalf of PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
November 9, 2017 Filing 289 NOTICE re #287 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (alew, )
November 9, 2017 Filing 288 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (alew, )
November 9, 2017 Filing 287 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:13-cv-00645. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/7/2017; that Tietex's motions to amend its answers and to transfer these actions for improper venue pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) (Doc. 211) are GRANTED as follows: 1. Tietex shall file its amended answers in both cases (see Docs. 268-1, 268-2) forthwith. Because the only amendment permitted is Tietex's denial of venue in this district, PFG's prior replies will be deemed responsive to the answers and counterclaims. 2. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), these actions are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, Spartanburg Division, for further proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/7/2017; that the motions to seal filed by PFG (Docs. 261, 276 in case no. 1:13CV645; Docs. 231, 246 in case no. 1:14CV650) are GRANTED IN PART as follows: 1. PFG's motions to seal Exhibit B are deemed moot, because Tietex has waived confidentiality as to that excerpt. The Clerk of Court is directed to UNSEAL Exhibit B (Doc. 261-1 in case no. 1:13CV645; Doc. 231-1 in case no. 1:14CV650); 2. PFG's motions to seal Exhibit D are granted, and Exhibit D shall remained sealed except for the unredacted page 12 Tietex filed (Doc. 269-1 in case no. 1:132CV645; Doc. 239-1 in case no. 1:14CV650); and 3. PFG's motions to seal Exhibit H (Doc. 276 in case no. 1:13CV645; Doc. 246 in case no. 1:14CV650) are GRANTED and Exhibit H shall remain sealed in its entirety. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 27, 2017 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION to Seal ( #246 in 1:14cv650, #276 in 1:13cv645). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 284 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority re (275 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 245 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Supplemental Memorandum,,, by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Eyetalk365, LLC v. Zmodo Technology Corp. Ltd., 16-cv-00789) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 283 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority re (275 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 245 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Supplemental Memorandum,,, by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, Zuru Ltd. v. Telebrands Bulbhead, LLC, 16-cv-00033, #2 Exhibit B Fox Factory, Inc. v. SRAM, LLC, cand-3-16-cv-03716-88) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 282 AMENDED DOCUMENT by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Amended Pretrial Disclosures). Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 281 NOTICE by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (Notice of Amended Pretrial Disclosures) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 280 BRIEF re (246 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 276 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:12-cv-00941-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ISSUED by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 10/16/2017. This case is currently on the October Master Trial Calendar with the Pretrial Conference set for October 24, 2017, and the Jury Trial set to begin on October 30, 2017. Presently before this court is the motion to transfer filed by Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. Pending resolution of Defendant's motion to transfer, the parties are directed to stand down from trial preparation. An opinion setting forth this court's decision and analysis will be forthcoming. SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650 (Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 279 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority re (275 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 245 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Supplemental Memorandum,,, by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A txsd-4-14-cv-02733-261 #1 ) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 278 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 277 SEALED UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., Counter Claimant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (275 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 245 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Supplemental Memorandum re (181 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 211 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Transfer Case or to Dismiss for Improper Venue in Light of Intervening Change of Law by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Motions Hearing 2017-09-15, # 2 Exhibit B - Tietex Resp to PL's Revised RFPs, # 3 Exhibit C - Exhibit 286, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of Robert Wallace Deposition 2017-09-26, # 5 Exhibit E - Exhibit 277, # 6 Exhibit F - Exhibit 263, # 7 Exhibit G - Excerpt of Doug Owens Deposition 2017-09-21, # 8 Exhibit H - Filed Under Seal Cover, # 9 Exhibit I - TIETEXESI1885124_image, # 10 Exhibit J - Exhibit 288, # 11 Exhibit K -Business Registration Division, # 12 Exhibit L - Exhibit 291, # 13 Exhibit M - Exhibit 289, # 14 Exhibit N - Exhibit 279, # 15 Exhibit O - Exhibit 290) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE). Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 276 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 10/24/2017 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 275 Supplemental Memorandum re (181 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 211 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Transfer Case or to Dismiss for Improper Venue in Light of Intervening Change of Law by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Motions Hearing 2017-09-15, #2 Exhibit B - Tietex Resp to PL's Revised RFPs, #3 Exhibit C - Exhibit 286, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of Robert Wallace Deposition 2017-09-26, #5 Exhibit E - Exhibit 277, #6 Exhibit F - Exhibit 263, #7 Exhibit G - Excerpt of Doug Owens Deposition 2017-09-21, #8 Exhibit H - Filed Under Seal Cover, #9 Exhibit I - TIETEXESI1885124_image, #10 Exhibit J - Exhibit 288, #11 Exhibit K -Business Registration Division, #12 Exhibit L - Exhibit 291, #13 Exhibit M - Exhibit 289, #14 Exhibit N - Exhibit 279, #15 Exhibit O - Exhibit 290) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 274 Supplemental Memorandum re (181 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 211 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Transfer Case or to Dismiss for Improper Venue in Light of Intervening Change of Law by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A 2017.09.26 Deposition of Tietex, #2 Exhibit - B 2017.09.21 Deposition of Doug Owens, #3 Exhibit - C 2017.09.29. Brown Letter to Pierce re Scope of 30b6 Topics and add'l information) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 3, 2017 CASE REFERRED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE: Supplemental Memorandum ( #244 in 1:14cv650, #274 in 1:13cv645) and Supplemental Memorandum ( #245 in 1:14cv650, #275 in 1:13cv645) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 26, 2017 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2 ( #234 in 1:14cv650, #264 in 1:13cv645), MOTION to Seal ( #231 in 1:14cv650 #261 in 1:13cv645), and MOTION to Strike (190) Response in Opposition to Motion, Regarding Exhibit J, ( #228 in 1:13cv645, #198 in 1:14cv650). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/22/2017. In connection with the parties' briefing on the pending motion to change venue referenced in this court's September 21, 2017 Text Order, the parties are directed to address the impact of the Federal Circuit's decision in In Re: Cray, Inc., Case No. 2017-129 (Fed. Cir. Sept. 21, 2017). SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 21, 2017 Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 10/30/2017 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2017 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/21/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference originally set for 9/25/2017 at 09:30 AM has been rescheduled to 10/24/2017 at 9:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. The Trial originally set for 10/4/2017 and moved to 10/5/2017 by consent of the parties is rescheduled to 10/30/2017 at 9:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Parties may brief the issue of venue by filing simultaneous briefs not exceeding 20 pages by 5:00 PM on 10/3/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 273 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/15/2017, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Bell, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:12-cv-00941-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Bell, Briana) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/19/2017. Following the hearing held on September 15, 2017, IT IS ORDERED that Precision Fabrics Group, Inc. (PFG) be permitted to conduct limited discovery into the issue of whether venue is proper in this district under 28 U.S.C. 1400(b). The court approves PFG's discovery requests as modified by TieTex International, Ltd. (Tietex), subject to the following additional changes: (1) limited discovery will be permitted into Tietex's sales revenue in the Middle District of North Carolina from August 2013 to present, including sales revenue attributable to the actions of employees located in the district; (2) for the purposes of venue discovery, the term employee will be defined to include third parties to whom Tietex has delegated an essential business function (e.g., customer service, direct sales, or product storage and distribution). Tietex shall produce the requested documents no later than close of business on Friday, September 22, 2017. Tietex shall make the requested witness(es) available, and they shall be deposed, no later than close of business on Tuesday, September 26, 2017. Depositions shall be limited to no more than four hours per witness. The pretrial hearing scheduled for Monday, September 25, 2017 will be rescheduled. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER in WS-2: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2017 regarding MOTION to Transfer Case or to Dismiss for Improper Venue in Light of Intervening Change of Law filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. ( #181 in 1:14cv650, #211 in 1:13cv645). Attorneys Lynne Borchers, Richard Coughlin, Peter Siddoway and Whit Pierce present for the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Mark Stafford and Marvin Quattlebaum present for the defendant. As discussed in open court, Parties are to email case manager by noon on 9/18/2017 whether the parties have worked out the discovery issues and have reached an agreement as to trial date. Plaintiff WITHDRAWS Motion to Seal regarding Motion in Limine No. 4. and Defendant consents ( #218 in 1:13CV645 and #188 in 1:14CV650). Court directs the Sealed Brief with attachments ( 219 in 1:13CV645 and #189 in 1:14CV650) UNSEALED. (Court Reporter Briana Bell.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 15, 2017 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Extension of Time for One-Day Continuance of Trial Date ( #272 in 1:13cv645, #242 in 1:14cv650). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 272 MOTION for Extension of Time for One-Day Continuance of Trial Date by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 271 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (228 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Strike (190) Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Regarding Exhibit J filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 270 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2017 at 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 269 RESPONSE in Support re (231 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Redacted Sales Information) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 268 REPLY, filed by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., to Response to (181 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 211 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Transfer Case or to Dismiss for Improper Venue in Light of Intervening Change of Law filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint (13-cv-645), #2 Exhibit B Proposed First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint (14-cv-650), #3 Exhibit C 2017.09.05 Supplemental Declaration of Wade Wallace) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 6, 2017 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION to Transfer Case or to Dismiss for Improper Venue in Light of Intervening Change of Law ( #181 in 1:14cv650, #211 in 1:13cv645) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 267 FINAL PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/1/2017, that any reply by Precision Fabrics Group, Inc. to the motion to amend answer and to change venue shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, September 6, 2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/1/2017 amending the #266 Order issued shortening the time for filing a reply to the motion by Tietex International, Ltd. to Amend Answers and to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Transfer to the District Court of South Carolina to reflect that the reply by Tietex, International, Ltd. to the motion to amend answer and to change venue shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, September 6, 2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Powell, Gloria) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (264 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 264 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2 by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed sur-reply, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 262 RESPONSE in Opposition re (228 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Strike (190) Response in Opposition to Motion, Regarding Exhibit J filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 9/12/2017 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 261 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - TIETEXESI1642348, #2 Exhibit D - Financial Information - TIETEXESI00939034) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 260 RESPONSE in Opposition re (181 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 211 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Transfer Case or to Dismiss for Improper Venue in Light of Intervening Change of Law filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Replies due by 9/11/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TIETEXESI1923363_image, #2 Exhibit B - Cover Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - TIETEXESI1286071_image, #4 Exhibit D - Cover FILED UNDER SEAL) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 259 TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 258 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (226 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 196 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 8 (Omnibus Motion in Limine) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Donald B. Thompson, Ph.D., NC State 30(b)(6) Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Ex 100 - NCSU 30(b)(6) 2015.04.07, #3 Exhibit C - Jan P. Ballard, Ph.D., NC State 30(b)(6) Deposition 04-07-2015, #4 Exhibit D - Anthony S. Deaton, NC State 30(b)(6) Deposition 04-07-2015) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 257 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (215 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard A. Coughlin, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Richard A. Coughlin, #3 Exhibit B to Delcaration of Richard A. Coughlin) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 256 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (220 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 190 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 255 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (224 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 194 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 7 (To Limit Evidence Related to the Doctrine of Equivalents) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 254 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (222 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 192 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Regarding the Inapplicbility of the "Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art" Standard) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Excerpts of VirnetX trial, #2 Exhibit B Excerpts of Horrocks Deposition-06.28.2017) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 253 NOTICE by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (Proposed Juror Questionnaire) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 252 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (213 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Dr. Horrocks's Aluminum Opinion) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 251 Proposed Voir Dire by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 250 TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 249 REPLY, filed by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., to Response to (209 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 179 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Prior Court and IPR Proceedings) filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 248 REPLY, filed by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., to Response to (207 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 177 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Joel Wacek filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 247 REPLY, filed by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., to Response to (175 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 205 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (to exclude Opinion Testimony of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Deposition of Bhat, #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental Depo of Bhat) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM S. BROWN on behalf of Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BROWN, WILLIAM) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 22, 2017 Reset Deadlines re (183 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 213 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Dr. Horrocks's Aluminum Opinion), (185 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 215 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford), (190 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 220 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling, (194 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 224 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 7 (To Limit Evidence Related to the Doctrine of Equivalents), (192 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 222 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Regarding the Inapplicbility of the "Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art" Standard), (196 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 226 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 8 (Omnibus Motion in Limine), (207 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Joel Wacek, (183 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives), (205 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (to exclude Opinion Testimony of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D., (209 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Prior Court and IPR Proceedings), (185 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) : Replies due by 8/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(Butler, Carol) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 245 Proposed Jury Verdict Form by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 244 RESPONSE in Opposition re (175 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 205 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (to exclude Opinion Testimony of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Replies due by 9/5/2017 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re (209 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 179 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Prior Court and IPR Proceedings) filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Replies due by 9/5/2017 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 242 RESPONSE in Opposition re (207 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 177 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Joel Wacek filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 241 RESPONSE BRIEF re (196 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 8 (Omnibus Motion in Limine) by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alford Report, #2 Exhibit B - Alford Addendum, #3 Exhibit C - Wacek Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Alford Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - Wallace Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - Thompson Deposition, #7 Exhibit G - Ballard Deposition, #8 Exhibit H - Deaton Deposition) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 240 RESPONSE BRIEF re (194 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 7 (To Limit Evidence Related to the Doctrine of Equivalents) by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AIPLA - Model Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - ND Calif Model Patent Jury Instructions, #3 Exhibit C - FCBA Model Patent Jury Instructions, #4 Exhibit D - Bhat Initial Report, #5 Exhibit E - Horrocks Initial Report, #6 Exhibit F - Horrocks Supplemental Report, #7 Exhibit G - Bhat Rebuttal Report, #8 Exhibit H - Horrocks 2015 Deposition, #9 Exhibit I - Horrocks 2017 Deposition, #10 Exhibit J - Holland Deposition) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 239 RESPONSE BRIEF re (192 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Regarding the Inapplicbility of the "Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art" Standard) by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bhat Initial Report, #2 Exhibit B - Bhat Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Horrocks Report, #4 Exhibit D - Bhat Rebuttal Report, #5 Exhibit E - Horrocks Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - PFG Email re Jury Instructions, #7 Exhibit G - PFG Proposed Jury Instructions, #8 Exhibit H - Tietex Proposed Jury Instructions, #9 Exhibit I - Joint Proposed Jury Instructions) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 238 RESPONSE BRIEF re (190 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Holland Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Holland Deposition Exhibit 150, #3 Exhibit C - Wallace Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Wildeman Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - Bhat Supplemental Report, #6 Exhibit F - Bhat Rebuttal Report, #7 Exhibit G - Bhat Initial Report, #8 Exhibit H - Horrocks Supplemental Report, #9 Exhibit I - Bhat Supplemental Deposition, #10 Exhibit J - Bhat Initial Deposition) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 237 RESPONSE BRIEF re (185 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford) by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015.07.15 Wacek Report and Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit B - Wacek Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - TIETEX_ESI0005756, #4 Exhibit D - Alford Report, #5 Exhibit E - Alford Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - Alford Report Addendum) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 236 RESPONSE BRIEF re (183 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Dr. Horrocks's Aluminum Opinion) by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015.11.11 Horrocks Initial Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - 2017.06.28 Horrocks Supplemental Deposition) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 235 Proposed Jury Verdict Form by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 234 RESPONSE filed by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (218 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal regarding Motion in Limine No. 4 [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4 filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 9/5/2017 Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 233 CORRECTED Objection to Pretrial Disclosures by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA (CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 232 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Objection to Pretrial Disclosures by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) Modified on 8/15/2017 to mark filed in error. Attorney to re-file corrected version. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 231 Objection to Pretrial Disclosures by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 230 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2017 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 229 BRIEF re #228 MOTION to Strike #190 Response in Opposition to Motion, Regarding Exhibit J. (BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 228 MOTION to Strike #190 Response in Opposition to Motion, Regarding Exhibit J by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Response to Motion due by 8/29/2017 (BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 227 BRIEF re (226 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 8 (Omnibus Motion in Limine) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Excerpts of Motions Hearing of October 25, 2016, #2 Exhibit B Excerpts of Larry Fraser deposition 2.26.2014, #3 Exhibit C Excerpts of Vincent Monfalcone, III deposition 4.25.2014, #4 Exhibit D Excerpts of Dr. Bhat 5-19-2017 deposition, #5 Exhibit E Ric Freeman _ Professional Profile) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 226 MOTION in Limine No. 8 (Omnibus Motion in Limine) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 225 BRIEF re (224 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 7 (To Limit Evidence Related to the Doctrine of Equivalents) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2016-10-25 Summary Judgment Hearing Transcript) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 224 MOTION in Limine No. 7 (To Limit Evidence Related to the Doctrine of Equivalents) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 223 BRIEF re (222 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Regarding the Inapplicbility of the "Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art" Standard) . Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 222 MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Regarding the Inapplicbility of the "Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art" Standard) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 221 BRIEF re (220 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Excerpts of 6.28.2017 Horrocks Depo.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 220 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Argument in Contradiction of the Court's Claim Construction Ruling by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2017 Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 218 **WITHDRAWN** MOTION to Seal regarding Motion in Limine No. 4 [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified on 9/15/2017 (See 9/15/2017 Minute Entry) (Engle, Anita). [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 217 DECLARATION of Richard A. Coughlin filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (215 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 216 REDACTED BRIEF re (215 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford) by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA (COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 215 MOTION in Limine No. 4 (to Partially Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Alford) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 214 BRIEF re (213 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Dr. Horrocks's Aluminum Opinion) by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Richard A. Coughlin) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 213 MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Dr. Horrocks's Aluminum Opinion) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 212 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. to Amend Answers and to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative to TRANSFER to the DISTRICT COURT OF SOUTH CAROLINA re (181 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 211 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Wade Wallace) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) Modified document title on 8/8/2017. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 211 MOTION by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. to Amend Answers and to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative to TRANSFER to the DISTRICT COURT OF SOUTH CAROLINA Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) Modified document title on 8/8/2017. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 210 BRIEF re (179 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Prior Court and IPR Proceedings) . Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 209 MOTION in Limine No. 3 (Regarding Prior Court and IPR Proceedings) by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2017 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 208 BRIEF re (177 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Joel Wacek . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2015.07.15 Report of Joel Wacek, #2 Exhibit B 2011.12.06 Email of Wallace, #3 Exhibit C 2015.10.22 Deposition of Joel Wacek) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 207 MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Joel Wacek by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2017 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 206 BRIEF re (175 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (to exclude Opinion Testimony of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 7.15.15 Initial Report and Appendix of G. Bhat, #2 Exhibit B 5.19.15 Deposition of G. Bhat, #3 Exhibit C 10.23.15 Deposition of G. Bhat, #4 Exhibit D 11.11.15 Deposition of Richard Horrocks, Ph.D, #5 Exhibit E 9.25.15 Rebuttal Report of G. Bhat, #6 Exhibit F 6.27.15 Supplemental Report of Richard Horrocks, Ph.D, #7 Exhibit G 8.5.17 Supplemental Report of G. Bhat) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA (CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 205 MOTION in Limine No. 1 (to exclude Opinion Testimony of Gajanan S. Bhat, Ph.D. by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2017 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) (Main Document 205 replaced on 8/8/2017) (Sheets, Jamie). [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 204 NOTICE of Trial Calendar Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Kemp, Donita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 203 NOTICE by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (155 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 202 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (153 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 183 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard A. Coughlin, #2 Exhibit A--Excerpts of Alford Deposition, #3 Exhibit B--Portions of Alford Report, #4 Exhibit C--Market Re-allocation, #5 Exhibit D--Addendum to Alford Report, #6 Exhibit E--Updated Market Re-allocation) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GILES M. SCHANEN, JR on behalf of Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(SCHANEN, GILES) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 200 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (185 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 155 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Whitney D. Pierce) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld on 7/28/2017 GRANTING (198) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (183 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 153 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA). The time for PFG to file its Reply Brief is extended until on or before Monday, July 31, 2017. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 28, 2017 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives) ( #168 in 1:14cv650, #198 in 1:13cv645). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 198 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (153 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 183 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/26/2017, that Tietex's motion for additional limited discovery (Doc. #181 ) in Case No. 1:13CV645; (Doc. #151 ) in Case No. 1:14CV650) is DENIED. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 24, 2017 Filing 196 Corrected document re (193 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Brief,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clean Proposed Joint Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - FCBA Model Jury Instructions, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Jury Instructions with Redlines & Comments) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 195 FINAL PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 194 BRIEF re (158 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 188 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Proposed Jury Instructions, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Horrocks Deposition - 6.28.2017) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 193 BRIEF re (158 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 188 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Proposed Jury Instructions, (Regarding Areas of Disagreement) by Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Clean Version of Instructions Proposed by Tietex, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - FCBA Model Jury Instructions, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Proposed Jury Instructions with Redlines and Comments) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 192 FINAL PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re (155 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark A. Stafford, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Stafford Decl. - 10.19.15 Stafford-Coughlin Ltr, #3 Exhibit Ex. B to Stafford Decl. - 10.28.15 Coughlin-Stafford Ltr, #4 Exhibit Ex. C to Stafford Decl. - 11.9.15 Stafford-Coughlin Ltr, #5 Exhibit Ex. D to Stafford Decl. - 11.10.15 Coughlin-Stafford Ltr, #6 Exhibit Ex. E to Stafford Decl. - Pierce-Stafford email, #7 Exhibit Ex. F to Stafford Decl. - 12.1.15 Stafford-Coughlin email, #8 Exhibit Ex. G to Stafford Decl. - 12.2.15 Stafford-Coughlin email, #9 Exhibit Ex. H to Stafford Decl. - 12.7.15 Jones-Coughlin email) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re (153 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Wacek Report (Excerpt), #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Wacek Depo (Excerpt), #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Dr. Alford Report (Exceprt), #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Dr. Alford Depo (Excerpt), #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Wallace Depo (Excerpt), #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Wildeman Depo (Excerpt), #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Receipt for Fabric Samples, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - 11.23.15 Coughlin-Stafford email, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - 11.25.15 Stafford-Coughlin email, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Tietex's 2d Amended Answers to PFG 2d IROGS, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - 10.19.15 Stafford Ltr to Coughlin) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 20, 2017 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Discovery (LIMITED ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME) ( #181 in 1:13cv645, #151 in 1:14cv650) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 189 REPLY, filed by Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., to Response to (151 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Discovery (LIMITED ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME) filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Excerpts from Deposition of Dr. Horrocks (06.28.17)) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 188 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. JOINT SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--PFG's Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B--Tietex's Proposed Jury Instructions) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Reset Response Deadlines per #180 Order re: #183 MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives) and #185 MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production). Responses due by 7/21/2017. (Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 187 RESPONSE in Opposition re (181 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Discovery (LIMITED ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME) filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Replies due by 7/24/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 186 BRIEF re (185 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 185 MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Regarding Post-Discovery Document Production) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 7/28/2017 Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 184 BRIEF re (183 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives) by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 183 MOTION in Limine No. 1 (Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 7/28/2017 Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Motions No Longer Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Discovery (LIMITED ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME) ( #181 in 1:13cv645, #151 in 1:14cv650) (Awaiting Response from Plaintiff) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 20, 2017 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Discovery (LIMITED ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME) ( #181 in 1:13cv645, #151 in 1:14cv650) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 182 SUPPORTING BRIEF re (181 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Discovery (LIMITED ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME) by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 181 MOTION for Discovery (LIMITED ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME) by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Response to Motion due by 7/10/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bhat Declaration) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 6/6/2017, setting the pretrial deadlines as set stated herein. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 5, 2017 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: JOINT MOTION TO SET PRETRIAL DEADLINES ( #149 in 1:14cv650, #179 in 1:13cv645). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 179 JOINT MOTION TO SET PRETRIAL DEADLINES by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 05/26/2017, granting #175 Motion to Continue in case 1:13-cv-00645; granting #145 Motion to Continue in case 1:14-cv-00650. The trial in this matter is continued from the July 2017 Term of Court and is reset to begin on October 4, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Winston- Salem, Courtroom number 2. The parties are directed to submit an agreed upon proposed amended pretrial schedule to the Magistrate Judge by June 2, 2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER in WS-2. Telephone Conference held on 5/26/2017 regarding #175 Motion to Continue Trial, written order forthcoming. The parties were instructed by the court to file an agreed upon pretrial schedule with Rule 26 requirements by June 2, 2017, which will be presented to the Magistrate Judge for approval. Richard Couglin, Lynne Borchers and Whitney Pierce present as counsel for plaintiff. James Robertson, Neil Jones, Mark Stafford and Arthur Quattlebaum, Jr. present as counsel for defendant. (Court Reporter Briana Bell.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:12-cv-00941-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Winchester, Robin) Modified on 5/26/2017 to remove jury instruction language and NEF regenerated. (Winchester, Robin). [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Set/Reset Jury Trial Hearing: Jury Trial set for 10/4/2017 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 25, 2017 Electronic Notice to Counsel on 5/25/2017. Telephone Conference set for May 26, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. on MOTION to Continue Trial ( #175 in 1:13cv645, #145 in 1:14cv650) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650 (Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 25, 2017 Set Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 5/26/2017 at 11:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645, 1:14-cv-00650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 177 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (175 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Continue Trial filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Replies due by 6/7/2017 Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE of Trial Calendar Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Williamson, Wanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Motions No Longer Submitted: MOTION to Continue Trial ( #175 in 1:13cv645, #145 in 1:14cv650). Per TC from Plaintiff's counsel, Plaintiff's Response to be filed 5/24/2017.Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION to Continue Trial ( #175 in 1:13cv645, #145 in 1:14cv650) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 175 MOTION to Continue Trial by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Responses due by 6/13/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 5/5/2017, that PFG's motion for leave to supplement Dr. Bhat's expert report is GRANTED as long as PFG makes Dr. Bhat available for deposition limited to his supplemental report during May 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that, as requested by Tietex, Tietex shall be permitted to supplement the report of Dr. Horrocks limited to any direct response to the material contained in Dr. Bhat's supplemental report at issue by June 15, 2017, provided that Tietex makes Dr. Horrocks available for deposition on his supplemental report before the end of June 2017. Each deposition shall be limited to 4 hours of questioning. Any determination as to costs or attorneys' fees will be deferred until disposition of this case. The case shall remain on the July civil calendar for trial. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Sonbay, Kenan) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 4/28/2017, that PFG's motion for reconsideration (Doc. #156 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to place this case on the trial calendar for the court's July civil term. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 1/19/2017 GRANTING Attorney ANTHONY P. DEROSA'S Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff (Doc. 171 in case 1:13cv645 and Doc. 141 in case 1:14cv650). ANTHONY P. DEROSA is hereby terminated as counsel in these proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 18, 2017 Filing 171 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ANTHONY P. DEROSA by on behalf of PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(DEROSA, ANTHONY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 13, 2017 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Reconsideration ( #156 in 1:13cv645, #127 in 1:14cv650) and MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat ( #149 in 1:13cv645, #120 in 1:14cv650) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 12, 2017 Filing 170 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (127 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 12, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE of Change of Address by PETER D. SIDDOWAY Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:12-cv-00941-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(SIDDOWAY, PETER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 12, 2017 Filing 168 NOTICE of Change of Address by LYNNE A. BORCHERS Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:12-cv-00941-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 167 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (120 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 1/4/2017, that the time for PFG to file its reply to Tietex's Response in Opposition to PFGs Motion for Leave to Supplement is extended until on or before Friday, January 6, 2017. Replies due by 1/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Butler, Carol) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 4, 2017 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to ( #131 in 1:14cv650, #160 in 1:13cv645) Response in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat ( #165 in 1:13cv645, #135 in 1:14cv650). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 3, 2017 Filing 165 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (131 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 160 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Response in Opposition to Motion, by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 29, 2016 Filing 164 RESPONSE in Opposition re (156 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 127 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Motion Hearing Excerpts) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 21, 2016 NOTICE of Docket Text/Event Modification re #163 Notice of Appearance, : at request of attorney to replace with correct image. (Butler, Carol) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 20, 2016 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ARTHUR MARVIN QUATTLEBAUM, JR on behalf of Counter Claimant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (QUATTLEBAUM, ARTHUR) (Main Document 163 replaced on 12/21/2016) (Butler, Carol). Modified on 12/21/2016 to replace with corrected image per request by attorney's office. (Butler, Carol) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/20/2016, that the time for Tietex to respond to PFG's Motion (Doc. #156 ) is extended until on or before December 29, 2016. (Consent Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 161 in Case No. 1:13CV645; Doc. 132 in Case No. 1:14CV650) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 20, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to MOTION for Reconsideration ( #161 in 1:13cv645, #132 in 1:14cv650). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 19, 2016 Filing 161 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (156 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 127 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 19, 2016 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re (120 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 149 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/14/2016, that the time for Tietex to respond to PFG's Motion to Supplement Expert Reports of Gajana Bhat (Doc. #149 ) is extended until on or before 12/19/2016. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 14, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat ( #158 in 1:13cv645, #129 in 1:14cv650). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 13, 2016 Filing 158 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (149 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 157 BRIEF re (156 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 127 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiffs PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 156 MOTION for Reconsideration re (123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 123 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 152 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Exclude,,, by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 12/22/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AMENDED ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/30/2016. For the reasons stated herein the motions to seal filed by PFG, TieTex, and Royal Adhesives (Docs. 113 and 118 in 1:13CV645 and Docs. 83 and 88 in 1:14CV650) are GRANTED. The parties are DIRECTED to file forthwith redacted versions of the documents they seek to seal if they have not already done so, pursuant to Local Rule 5.4. This order replaces the identical order entered September 30, 2016, correcting typographically mis-numbered footnotes. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 154 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/25/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:12-cv-00941-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Nesbit, Briana) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 22, 2016 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (Corrected) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/21/2016. For the reasons stated herein, PFG's motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 111 in case 1:13cv645, Doc. 81 in case 1:14cv650) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART and PFG's motion to exclude expert testimony (Doc. 116 in case 1:13cv645, Doc. 86 in case 1:14cv650) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650 (Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 151 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (120 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gajanan Bhat, #2 Exhibit B--Tietex's Non-Infringement Contentions, #3 Exhibit C--Tietex's Non-Infringement Contentions, #4 Exhibit D--Tietex's Responses to PFG's Interrogatories) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 150 BRIEF re (120 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat . Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 149 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports of Dr. Gajanan Bhat by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 7, 2016 CASE REFERRED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE: Notice of Withdrawal of State Law Counterclaims ( #147 in 1:13CV645 and #118 in 1:14CV650) and Notice Regarding Tietex's Counterclaim for Abuse of Process ( #148 in 1:13CV645 and #119 in 1:14CV650). Associated Cases: 1:13CV645, 1:14CV650 (Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 148 NOTICE by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Regarding Tietex's Counterclaim for Abuse of Process Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. of Withdrawal of State Law Counterclaims Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 25, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER in WS-2: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2016 re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ( #111 in 1:13cv645 and 81 in 1:14cv650) and MOTION to Exclude ( #116 in 1:13cv645 and #86 in 1:14cv650) filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Attorneys Coughlin, DeRosa, Borchers, Siddoway and Pierce appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Jones, Stafford and Quattlebaum appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Arguments presented. Parties may submit briefs on Defendants' abusive process counterclaim. Briefs are due 11/1/2016 and are not to exceed 5 pages. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 146 BRIEF re (89 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 119 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) SEALED Attachments to Main Document, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G-Redacted, #7 Exhibit H) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 145 BRIEF re (84 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 114 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) SEALED Attachments to Main Document, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I-Redacted, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit M, #10 Exhibit N-Redacted, #11 Exhibit Q, #12 Exhibit R, #13 Exhibit S, #14 Exhibit U, #15 Exhibit V-Redacted, #16 Exhibit W) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 5, 2016 Filing 144 NOTICE of Rescheduling: Motion Hearing reset for 10/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 3, 2016 Filing 143 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2016 at 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/30/2016. For the reasons stated herein the motions to seal filed by PFG, TieTex, and Royal Adhesives (Docs. 113 and 118 in 1:13CV645 and Docs. 83 and 88 in 1:14CV650) are GRANTED. The parties are DIRECTED to file forthwith redacted versions of the documents they seek to seal if they have not already done so, pursuant to Local Rule 5.4. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650 (Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 1, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE of Cancellation: Case set for JURY TRIAL on the JULY MASTER CALENDAR TERM has been CANCELLED until further notice. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 19, 2016 Filing 140 NOTICE of Trial Calendar Jury Trial set for 7/11/2016 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #2 before JUDGE N. C. TILLEY JR. (Williamson, Wanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 18, 2016 Motions No Longer Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (139 in 1:13cv645 and 110 in 1:14cv650) JOINT MOTION for Special Setting Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 16, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (139 in 1:13cv645 and 110 in 1:14cv650) JOINT MOTION for Special Setting. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 12, 2016 Filing 139 JOINT MOTION for Special Setting by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
February 23, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, (111 in 1:13cv645 and 81 in 1:14cv650); MOTION to Seal, (113 in 1:13cv645 and 83 in 1:14cv650); MOTION to Exclude,(116 in 1:13cv645 and 86 in 1:14cv650); and MOTION to Seal IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE, (118 in 1:13cv645 and 88 in 1:14cv650). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
February 17, 2016 Filing 138 DECLARATION of Whitney D. Pierce filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (135 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Reply to Response to Motion, filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 137 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (86 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 116 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Exclude filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 136 ***FILED IN ERROR*** DECLARATION of Whitney D. Pierce filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (135 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Reply to Response to Motion, filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified on 2/17/2016 to mark filed in error per p/c with attorney. Attorney to refile. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 135 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (111 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 29, 2016 Filing 134 REPLY, filed by Counter Defendants PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (113 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 83 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal , (118 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 88 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 27, 2016 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re (111 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 2/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Neil Jones, #2 Exhibit Ex A - US Patent 8,501,639, #3 Exhibit Ex B - US Patent 8,796,162, #4 Exhibit Ex C - Bhat Expert Report 2015.07.09, #5 Exhibit Ex D - Expert Report of Richard Horrocks 2015.08.28, #6 Exhibit Ex E - Bhat Rebuttal Expert Report 2015.09.25, #7 Exhibit Ex F - Horrocks depo 111115, #8 Exhibit Ex G - Horrocks Exhibit 238, #9 Exhibit Ex H - Bhat, Gajanan depo 2015.06.10, #10 Exhibit Ex I - Bhat Gajanan depo 2015.10.23, #11 Exhibit Ex J - 2015.08.04 IPR Petition re '162, #12 Exhibit Ex K - Stephen Holland depo 052915, #13 Exhibit Ex L - 2015.08.04 1003 Horrocks Declaration, #14 Exhibit Ex M - Ex 237 - Horrocks 2015.11.11, #15 Exhibit Ex N - Rowan U.K. Patent Application 2,293,572, #16 Exhibit Ex O - 2014.02.26 Larry Fraser, #17 Exhibit Ex P - Ex 13 - Fraser 2014.02.26, #18 Exhibit Ex Q - Ex 11 - Fraser 2014.02.26, #19 Exhibit Ex R - Ex 12 - Fraser 2014.02.26, #20 Exhibit Ex S - IntroToExperimentalErrors_y2) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 27, 2016 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re (116 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 86 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Exclude A. Richard Horrocks, PhD filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 2/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Neil Jones, #2 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Richard Horrocks 2015.08.28, #3 Exhibit B - Bhat Gajanan depo 2015.10.23, #4 Exhibit C - Horrocks depo 2015.11.11) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 1/26/2016, granting Motion for Extension of Time to respond to four motions (Doc. #128 in Case No. 1:13CV645 and Doc. 98 in 1:14CV650). Tietex response to PFG's Motions due on or before 1/27/2016. (Doc. #111 , #113 , #116 , #118 and and Doc. 81, 83, 86, 88 in 1:14CV650. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 25, 2016 Filing 130 RESPONSE filed by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (113 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 83 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., (118 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 88 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Holland Deposition Transcript, #2 REDACTED Wildeman Deposition Transcript) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 25, 2016 Filing 129 RESPONSE re #113 MOTION to Seal and Motion to Seal filed by ROYAL ADHESIVES AND SEALANTS, LLC.. Replies due by 2/11/2016. (REICHARD, JEFFREY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 22, 2016 Filing 128 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Two Days by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 22, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER Re: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Two Days (98 in 1:14cv650, 128 in 1:13cv645). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM ORDER Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 1/14/2016. For the reasons stated herein, the Motion for Reconsideration filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. ( #93 in 1:13cv645 and #63 in 1:14cv650) is DENIED. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/31/2015. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Royal Adhesives and Sealants, LLC to respond to PFG's motions to seal #113 (13cv645) and docket entry No.: 83 (1:14cv650) is extended until January 25, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 30, 2015 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response ( #124 in 1:13cv645 and #94 in 1:14cv650) Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650 (Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 29, 2015 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JEFFREY M. REICHARD on behalf of Select Role Type Royal Adhesives and Sealants, LLC (REICHARD, JEFFREY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 29, 2015 Filing 124 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Royal Adhesives and Sealants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(REICHARD, JEFFREY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/23/2015, granting Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #122 in case 13cv645 and Doc. 92 in case 14cv650). The time for Tietex to respond to PFG's Motions (Docs. #111 , #113 , #116 , #118 in case 13cv645 and Docs. 81, 83, 86, 88 in case 14cv650) is extended through January 25, 2016. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 22, 2015 Motions Submitted: (92 in 1:14cv650, 122 in 1:13cv645) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (111 in 1:13cv645), MOTION for Summary Judgment (113 in 1:13cv645, 83 in 1:14cv650), MOTION to Seal (118 in 1:13cv645) to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Kemp, Donita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 21, 2015 Filing 122 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (111 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (113 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 83 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal , (118 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 88 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Seal IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE, (116 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 86 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Exclude , (81 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Summary Judgment by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/15/2015, that Plaintiff Precision Fabrics Group, Inc. is granted a fourteen (14) day extension of time to consult with Defendant Tietex International, LTD., pursuant to Local Rule 5.4, in connection with Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Docs. #115 , #120 in case 13cv645, Docs. 85, 90 in case 650). (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 15, 2015 Motions Submitted: (85 in 1:14cv650, 115 in 1:13cv645) MOTION for Extension of Time for Consultation under Rule 5.4, (90 in 1:14cv650, 120 in 1:13cv645 MOTION for Extension of Time for Consultation Under Rule 5.4 to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Kemp, Donita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 120 MOTION for Extension of Time for Consultation Under Rule 5.4 by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 119 SEALED Brief to #116 MOTION to Exclude. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified document title on 12/15/2015. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 118 MOTION to Seal IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Responses due by 1/7/2016 Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Whitney D. Pierce filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (116 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Exclude filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 116 MOTION by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. to Exclude Expert Testimony of RICHARD HORROCKS. Responses due by 1/7/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA. (COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified document title on 12/15/2015. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time for Consultation under Rule 5.4 by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 114 SEALED Brief to #111 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit M, #10 Exhibit N, #11 Exhibit Q, #12 Exhibit R, #13 Exhibit S, #14 Exhibit U, #15 Exhibit V, #16 Exhibit W) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified document title on 12/15/2015. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 113 MOTION to Seal by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Responses due by 1/7/2016 Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Whitney D. Pierce filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (111 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit O, #6 Exhibit P, #7 Exhibit T, #8 Exhibit X, #9 Exhibit Y) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 111 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Responses due by 1/14/2016. (COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified document title on 12/15/2015. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 7, 2015 Filing 110 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (69 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Reply to Response to Motion, filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/04/2015 in case1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA granting #70 Motion for Leave to File in case 14cv650. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Precision Fabrics Group, Inc., may file its proposed short surreply doc [70-1] in response to Defendant Tietex International, Ltd.'s reply brief in support of its motion to reconsider the court's claim construction Order. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting (106) Motion for Leave in case 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA; granting (76) Motion for Leave in case 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, as set out herein. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Butler, Carol) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 4, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: #106 Consent MOTION for Leave to Modify Joint Stipulation and Order Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Williamson, Wanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 3, 2015 Filing 107 BRIEF re (106 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Consent MOTION for Leave to Modify Joint Stipulation and Order Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 3, 2015 Filing 106 Consent MOTION for Leave to Modify Joint Stipulation and Order Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 2, 2015 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (70 in 1:14cv650, 100 in 1:13cv645) MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Tietex's Motion to Reconsider Court's Claim Construction Order. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion Extend deadline to file dispositive motions until 12/11/2015 by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 20, 2015 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: (75 in 1:14cv650 and 105 in 1:13cv645) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend deadline to file dispositive motions until 12/11/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14cv650, 1:13cv645(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 20, 2015 TEXT ORDER granting (105) Joint Motion to Extend Deadline in case 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA and (75) Joint Motion to Extend Deadline in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA. The parties shall file any dispositive motion(s) by 12/11/2015. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/20/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 19, 2015 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: (104 in 1:13cv645, 74 in 1:14cv650) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney LANCE A. LAWSON. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 19, 2015 TEXT ORDER granting (104) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA and (74) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA. Attorney LANCE A. LAWSON is terminated as counsel of record for Precision Fabrics Group in those cases. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 18, 2015 Filing 104 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney LANCE A. LAWSON by on behalf of PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Responses due by 12/14/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(LAWSON, LANCE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 16, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 16, 2015 Filing 102 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 6, 2015 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (70 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Tietex's Motion to Reconsider Court's Claim Construction Order filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 6, 2015 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Tietex's Motion to Reconsider Court's Claim Construction Order by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Responses due by 11/30/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Surreply, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 6, 2015 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (93 in 1:13cv645 and 63 in 1:14cv650) MOTION for Reconsideration re Memorandum Opinion and Order (57 in 1:13cv645 and 28 in 1:14cv650). Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650. (Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 5, 2015 Filing 99 REPLY, filed by Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., to Response to (93 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 63 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (57 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 57 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Memorandum and Opinion,, Order, filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 23, 2015 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re (64 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Memorandum,, filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 22, 2015 TEXT ORDER granting #97 Consent Motion for Leave in that the parties may depose Dr. A. Richard Hooks on 11/11/2015. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/22/2015. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 22, 2015 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: (97 in 1:13cv645, 67 in 1:14cv650) Consent MOTION for Leave to Conduct Deposition After Close of Expert Depositions. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 21, 2015 Filing 97 Consent MOTION for Leave to Conduct Deposition After Close of Expert Depositions by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 14, 2015 Filing 96 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (65 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 95 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Consent MOTION for Leave to Conduct Deposition filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 13, 2015 Filing 95 Consent MOTION for Leave to Conduct Deposition by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 29, 2015 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (63 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 93 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (57 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 57 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Memorandum and Opinion,, Order, filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Japanese '057 Application, #2 Exhibit B - Office Action, #3 Exhibit C - PFG's Response to Office Action) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 29, 2015 Filing 93 MOTION for Reconsideration re (57 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 57 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Memorandum and Opinion,, Order, by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Responses due by 10/23/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 8, 2015 Filing 92 NOTICE of Settlement of Expenses related to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/10/2015, that the parties shall have an additional two weeks to complete each of the expert witness disclosures and depositions set forth in Local Patent Rules 105.1 and 105.2, as follows: 1) expert witness disclosures on the issues on which the opposing party bears the burden of proof will be served by August 28, 2015; 2) any rebuttal expert witness disclosures permitted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 will be served by September 25, 2015; and 3) depositions of expert witnesses disclosed under Local Patent Rule 105.1 will be completed by November 2, 2015. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 11, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: #89 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Expert Witness Disclosures and Depositions, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Williamson, Wanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 10, 2015 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/10/2015, that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Docket Entry #60 ) is DENIED IN PART AS MOOT, in that, Plaintiff has shown no entitlement to an order compelling further discovery from Defendant. FURTHER that, on or before August 24, 2015, Plaintiff either 1) shall file a Notice with the Court renouncing any expense-shifting; or 2) shall serve Defendant with a statement setting out the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, Plaintiff incurred in making the instant Motion. Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this Order will result in denial of any expense-shifting. FURTHER that, if Plaintiff timely serves such a statement of reasonable expenses, Defendant shall file, on or before September 8, 2015, either: 1) a Notice indicating its and/or its counsel's agreement to pay the claimed expenses; or 2) a Memorandum of no more than ten pages setting out Defendant's argument as to why the Court should not require Defendant and/or its counsel to pay such expenses (including any argument challenging the reasonableness of such expenses), along with a certification that, since the date of this Order, Defendant has attempted to confer in good faith with Plaintiff about resolution of the issue of expense-shifting. Failure by Defendant to comply with this Order will result in the Court ordering, upon the filing of a Notice by Plaintiff of its reasonable expenses as contained in the statement served upon Defendant, the payment of such expenses by Defendant. FURTHER that, on or before September 29, 2015, Plaintiff shall file a Response of no more than ten pages to any Memorandum timely filed by Defendant. Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this Order will result in denial of any expense-shifting. FURTHER that, on or before October 6, 2015, Defendant may file a Reply of no more than five pages to any Response timely filed by Plaintiff. FURTHER that, upon completion of the foregoing briefing or the time for such briefing, the Clerk shall refer this matter back to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for further action.(Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 10, 2015 Filing 89 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Expert Witness Disclosures and Depositions by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 3, 2015 Filing 88 REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.filed PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (71 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 41 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, (Redacted) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified on 8/10/2015 to reflect Reply as counsel was instructed in Text Order dated 8/3/2015. (Powell, Gloria). [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 3, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply< (Redacted)< by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (51 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) i<. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified on 8/10/2015 to reflect Motion as counsel was instructed in Text Order dated 8/3/2015. (Powell, Gloria) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 3, 2015 TEXT ORDER directing Plaintiff to file redacted copies of its Reply and Motion for Leave on the public docket as standalone docket entries linked to their respective sealed docket entries as described and attached to #56 Memorandum filed in 14cv650. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/03/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 30, 2015 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re: 7/23/2015 {TEXT Order}. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 28, 2015 Filing 85 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (60 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 23, 2015 TEXT ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a memorandum of no more than ten pages, on or before 07/30/2015, showing cause why #71 Reply and 81 Motion for Leave should remain sealed in their entirety. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/23/2015. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 23, 2015 TEXT ORDER granting 81 Motion for Leave. On or before 07/30/2015, Plaintiff may file a rebuttal of no more than five pages to #78 Sur-reply. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/23/2015. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 17, 2015 Filing 84 RESPONSE to Tietex's Opposition to PFG's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Replies due by 8/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 16, 2015 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re (81 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 51 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 8/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 16, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: (81 in 1:13cv645, 51 in 1:14cv650) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Associated Cases: 1:13cv645, 1:14cv650(Kemp, Donita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 82 Additional Attachments to Main Document re (81 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Proposed Order). Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 14, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CASSANDRA L. CRAWFORD on behalf of Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 10, 2015 Filing 79 SEALED Attachments to Main Document to (73 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) SEALED Document,,, Declaration Regarding Corrected Exhibit N to Document 73. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exh N) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) Modified on 7/14/2015 to correct access by request of counsel. (Hellwig, Tammi). [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 2, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: (60 in 1:13cv00645, 31 in 1:14cv00650) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Associated Cases: 1:13cv00645, 1:14cv00650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 1, 2015 Filing 78 SURREPLY filed by Counter Claimant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (40 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 70 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Response to Motion,,, (41 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 71 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, (60 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - emails, #2 Exhibit B - Second Declaration of Reed Cunningham, #3 Exhibit C - emails, #4 Exhibit D - Wildeman depo excerpt) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 7/1/2015, that the parties shall have an additional two weeks to complete each of the expert witness disclosures and depositions set forth in Local Patent Rules 105.1 and 105.2 as follows: 1) expert witness disclosures on the issues on which each party bears the burden of proof shall be served by July 15, 2015; 2) expert witness disclosures on the issues on which the opposing party bears the burden of proof shall be served by August 14, 2015; 3) any rebuttal expert witness disclosures permitted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 shall be served by August 28, 2015; 4) depositions of expert witnesses disclosed under Local Patent Rule 105.1 shall be completed by October 5, 2015. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 1, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: (46 in 1:14-cv-00650, 76 in 1:13-cv-00645) Joint MOTION for Leave to Extend Time for Expert Witness Disclosures and Depositions to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645, 1:14-cv-00650(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 30, 2015 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Leave to Extend Time for Expert Witness Disclosures and Depositions by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 24, 2015 TEXT ORDER granting in part #74 Motion for Leave in case 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA and #44 Motion for Leave in case 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, in that Defendant may file a sur-reply of no more than five pages to #71 Reply by 07/01/2015. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 06/24/2015. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 22, 2015 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (74 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 44 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 22, 2015 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Responses due by 7/16/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 73 SEALED DOCUMENT of Richard A. Coughlin (CORRECTED) re (41 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 71 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, (60 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. by Plaintiffs PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 72 SEALED DOCUMENT of Richard A. Coughlin re (41 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 71 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, (60 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. Declaration of Richard A. Coughlin in Support of Precision Fabric Group, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 71 SEALED REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., to Response to (60 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
June 1, 2015 Filing 70 RESPONSE filed by Defendants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. re (60 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 6/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Declaration of Reed Cunningham, #2 Exhibit Exh B - May 18 email, #3 Exhibit Exh C - May 21 email, #4 Exhibit Exh D - May 22 email, #5 Exhibit Exh E - May 26 email, #6 Exhibit Exh F - May 27 email, #7 Exhibit Exh G - May 28 email, #8 Exhibit Exh H - May 28 email, #9 Exhibit Exh I - May 28 email, #10 Exhibit Exh J - May 29 email) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 29, 2015 Filing 69 MOTION Leave to Conduct Deposition After Close of Fact Discovery by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 29, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: #69 MOTION Leave to Conduct Deposition After Close of Fact Discovery , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 29, 2015 TEXT ORDER granting (69) Motion for Leave in case 1:13cv645 and (39) Motion for Leave in case 1:14cv650. Plaintiff may take the deposition of Martin Wildeman on 06/09/2015. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 05/29/2015. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 28, 2015 TEXT ORDER granting #68 Consent Motion for Leave. Plaintiff may conduct the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Defendant on 06/05/2015. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 05/28/2015. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 27, 2015 Filing 68 Consent MOTION for Leave to Conduct Deposition After Close of Fact Discovery by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 27, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: #68 Consent MOTION for Leave to Conduct Deposition After Close of Fact Discovery, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 11, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE of Hearing: Master Trial Calendar: Jury Trial set for 7/11/2016 at 09:30 AM in Unassigned Courtroom before UNASSIGNED JUDGE. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Engle, Anita) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 11, 2015 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Support re (34 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule re Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel [ECF No. 60] filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Replies due by 5/29/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Prior Offer to Supplement, #2 Exhibit B - Emails from Neil Jones, #3 Exhibit C - TieTex's 1st Set of Production Requests) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD)[Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 11, 2015 TEXT ORDER denying #63 Motion to Expedite. The issues and circumstances surrounding #60 Motion to Compel appear sufficiently complicated to render expedited briefing on #60 Motion to Compel unwarranted. Further, if Plaintiff prevails on #60 Motion to Compel, the Court can fashion relief that allows Plaintiff to obtain necessary discovery (including follow-up discovery based on any ordered production) after the currently-scheduled close of discovery. Sufficient time for such a remedy exists in this case, given that #67 Notice has set trial for July 2016. Finally, if any necessary follow-up discovery results in increased expenses (such as by requiring re-opening of depositions), the Court will entertain a request by Plaintiff to shift those increased expenses to Defendant. In the interim, the Court encourages both parties to take a hard look at the outstanding issues and to make sure that all positions taken can withstand the close scrutiny that will follow once briefing on #60 Motion to Compel concludes. If the Court detects gamesmanship or other discovery abuse, the responsible party and/or attorney(s) should anticipate appropriate consequences. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 05/11/2015. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 8, 2015 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule re Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel [ECF No. 60] filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 5/26/2015. (STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 8, 2015 TEXT ORDER requiring Defendant to file any response to #63 Motion to Expedite by Noon on 05/11/2015, pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(f). Good cause exists for this action because allowing the normal response time as to #63 Motion would effectively deny the relief requested. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 05/08/2015. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 7, 2015 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM re (34 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 63 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule re Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel [ECF No. 60] by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 7, 2015 Filing 63 MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule re Precision Fabrics Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel [ECF No. 60] by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 7, 2015 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Lynne A. Borchers re (60 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PFG 2nd RFPs, #2 Exhibit B - Tietex Response to RFPs, #3 Exhibit C - 9-22 Email, #4 Exhibit D - 10-15 Email, #5 Exhibit E - 10-24 Email, #6 Exhibit F - 10-30 Email, #7 Exhibit G - 11-6 Email, #8 Exhibit H - 11-13 Email, #9 Exhibit I - 12-15 Email, #10 Exhibit J - 4-14 Letter, #11 Exhibit K - 4-17 Email, #12 Exhibit L - 5-4 Letter, #13 Exhibit M - 5-6 Email) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 7, 2015 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM re (60 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
May 7, 2015 Filing 60 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Tietex International, Ltd. by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Responses due by 6/1/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LANCE A. LAWSON on behalf of Plaintiffs PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(LAWSON, LANCE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
April 7, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PETER D. SIDDOWAY on behalf of Plaintiffs PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(SIDDOWAY, PETER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 1/15/2015, that PFG's motion to strike (Doc. #38 ) is DENIED, but the opinion of Dr. Wilkie will not be considered, and the disputed claim term "intumescent" from the '162 and '639 patents is construed to describe "a substance that swells and chars upon exposure to heat or flame." Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 56 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/23/2014 before Judge THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Pittman, Telephone number 919-931-6222. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2015. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 23, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Markman Hearing held on 12/23/2014. Lynne Borchers, Esq., Anthony DeRosa, Esq. and Richard Coughlin, Esq. for the Plaintiff. Neil Jones, Esq., Mark Stafford, Esq. and James Robertson, Esq. for the Defendant. Matter taken under advisement; written opinion forthcoming. (Court Reporter Tori Pittman, Pittman Stenography, 919-931-6222.) (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 23, 2014 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES M. ROBERTSON on behalf of Counter Claimants TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. and Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 16, 2014 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Lynne A. Borchers filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (54 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 26 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Reply to Response to Motion, filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from Wilkie Deposition Transcript) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 16, 2014 Filing 54 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., to Response to (38 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) MOTION to Strike the Declaration and Preclude Testimony of Dr. Wilkie filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 15, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/15/2014. Attorneys Lynne Borchers, Anthony DeRosa and Whit Pierce present for plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Stafford and Neil Jones present for defendant. Order forthcoming. Proceedings recorded. (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 15, 2014 TEXT ORDER setting the following deadlines: 1) on or before 01/14/2015, Plaintiff shall serve its Preliminary Infringement Contentions as to the 162 Patent; 2) on or before 03/02/2015, Defendant shall serve its Preliminary Non-Infringement and Invalidity Contentions as to the 162 Patent and shall file any motion requesting additional discovery devices beyond those authorized by the scheduling order from the consolidated case involving the 639 Patent (which, by virtue of the unopposed consolidation, governs this case as well); and 3) on or before 06/01/2015, fact discovery regarding the 162 Patent shall conclude. Further, at the hearing on 12/15/2014, Defendant withdrew the request in #52 Joint Report for any claim construction litigation beyond that already contemplated as to the 639 Patent. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/15/2014. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.] (Entered: 12/17/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Strike the Declaration and Preclude Testimony of Dr. Wilkie filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 12/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit '639 Patent)(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Joint Report Pursuant to the Court's Order of November 18, 2014 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANTHONY P. DEROSA on behalf of Plaintiffs PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(DEROSA, ANTHONY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LYNNE A. BORCHERS on behalf of Plaintiffs PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 49 RESPONSE re #36 Brief Claim Construction filed by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Replies due by 12/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit McGraw-Hill, pg 374, #2 Exhibit McGraw-Hill, pgs 374, 650)(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE of Manual Filing Exhibit H to Declaration of Lynne A. Borchers in Support of PFG's Responsive Claim Construction Brief in paper form with the Clerk's Office Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Lynne A. Borchers filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re (20 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Brief filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - CD-ROM (filed manually), #2 Exhibit I - U.S. Patent No. 8,796,162) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 46 Responsive Claim Construction BRIEF by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KIMBERLY BULLOCK GATLING on behalf of Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(GATLING, KIMBERLY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WHITNEY D. PIERCE on behalf of Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2014 TEXT ORDER granting (43) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney D. MARSH PRAUSE terminated is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/01/2014. Associated Case: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 1, 2014 Motions Referred: RE: #43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney D. MARSH PRAUSE , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Williamson, Wanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 25, 2014 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney D. MARSH PRAUSE by on behalf of PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PRAUSE, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Counterclaims) by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 18, 2014 Set Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2014 10:00 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 18, 2014 MINUTE ORDER setting this case for an Initial Pretrial Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 12/15/2014. By 12/10/2014, the parties shall file a Joint Report setting out all agreed and disputed, proposed modifications to the governing scheduling order. Even if the parties report agreement on all proposed modifications, their counsel shall appear at the Initial Pretrial Conference, unless the Court enters a further order relieving them of that obligation. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/18/2014. (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 41 Initial Claim Construction BRIEF by Counter Claimant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '639 Patent with C of Correction, #2 Exhibit B - Hedge 2006 - Influence of Material Variables in Thermal, #3 Exhibit C - Adanur 1995 - Wellington Sears Heandbook of Industrial Textiles, #4 Exhibit D - Prosecution History, #5 Exhibit E - Baldwin Dec. Dec. 19, 2012, #6 Exhibit F - Baldwin Dec. Jan. 23, 2013, #7 Exhibit G - Baldwin Dec. Feb 22, 2013, #8 Exhibit H - Claims Prior to First Baldwin Declaration, #9 Exhibit I - Claims Adding Stitchbonded, #10 Exhibit J - Baldwin Interview Summary Record, #11 Exhibit K - Notice of Allowance, #12 Exhibit L - Disclosure 1 11.29.00, #13 Exhibit M - Disclosure 2 3.21.01, #14 Exhibit N - Disclosure 3 4.29.01, #15 Exhibit O - Disclosure 4 6.27.01, #16 Exhibit P - Disclosure 5 7.02.01, #17 Exhibit Q - Monfalcone depo 2014.04.25, #18 Exhibit R - Provisional Application, #19 Exhibit S - Non-Provisional Application, #20 Exhibit T - UK Patent App 2,293,572 (Rowan), #21 Exhibit U - US Patent 4,061,579 (Sawko), #22 Exhibit V - Wilkie Filed Declaration)(JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Lynne A. Borchers filed by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re #38 MOTION to Strike the Declaration and Preclude Testimony of Dr. Wilkie filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent No. 8,501,639, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wilkie Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Wilkie Depositions)(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 39 BRIEF re #38 MOTION to Strike the Declaration and Preclude Testimony of Dr. Wilkie by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 38 MOTION to Strike the Declaration and Preclude Testimony of Dr. Wilkie by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Responses due by 12/11/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 37 DECLARATION re #36 Brief by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 8,501,639, #2 Exhibit B-1 - Prosecution History of '639 Patent (part 1), #3 Exhibit B-2 - Prosecution History of '639 Patent (part 2), #4 Exhibit C - US Patent No. 3,934,066, #5 Exhibit D - US Patent No. 5,091,243, #6 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Wilkie Depositions, #7 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 4,216,261, #8 Exhibit G - GB Patent No. 2293572)(BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 36 Opening Claim Construction BRIEF by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. re Order, (Joint Notice in Response to the Court's Order of November 3, 2014) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 10, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Rescheduling: Markman Hearing set for 12/23/2014 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing set for 11/20/2014 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 6, 2014 Set Hearings: Markman Hearing set for 11/20/2014 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
November 3, 2014 TEXT ORDER directing the parties promptly to consult and, by 11/17/2014, to file a joint notice advising the Court as to whether, in light of the consolidation of this case with case number 1:13cv645, a new initial pretrial conference is required and/or alterations to the governing scheduling order are required. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/03/2014. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 30, 2014 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 16, 2014 Filing 31 RESPONSE re (28 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 28 in 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA) Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Answer to Counterclaims filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA, 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 16, 2014 Filing 30 RESPONSE re (9 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 9 in 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA) Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Answer to Counterclaims filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 16, 2014 Filing 29 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00650-TDS-LPA, 1:13-cv-00645-TDS-LPA(PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 28 Tietex International, LTD.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Counterclaim against by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 27 Supplemental AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC..(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 4, 2014 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental and Amended Complaint and for Consolidation. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(k), the failure of Defendant to file a response to the instant #25 Motion warrants granting the relief requested. On or before 09/11/2014, Plaintiff shall file its Supplemental and Amended Complaint in the form contemplated by the instant #25 Motion and the Clerk shall consolidate this action with Case No. 1:14-cv-650. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/04/2014. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 2, 2014 Motions Referred: RE: #25 MOTION to Amend Complaint and for Consolidation, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 5, 2014 Filing 26 BRIEF to #25 MOTION for Leave to file a Supplemental or Amended Complaint and or for Consolidation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified duplicate text on 8/7/2014. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 5, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC for Leave to file a Supplemental or Amended Complaint and or for Consolidation. Responses due by 8/29/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified document title on 8/7/2014. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 24 STATEMENT (JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT) by Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of GAM Butterworth, #2 Declaration of Charles Wilkie, #3 CV of Charles Wilkie)(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
July 8, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LYNNE A. BORCHERS on behalf of Counter Defendants PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC., Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (BORCHERS, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
April 21, 2014 Filing 22 ANSWER to Second Amended Counterclaims by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified document title on 4/22/2014. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 21, 2014 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time for PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. to File Answer to Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Answer due by 4/21/2014. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 3/21/2014. (Brubaker, John) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 12, 2014 Filing 20 Second Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 12, 2014 Filing 19 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer and Counterclaims by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaims)(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 12, 2014 Motions Referred: RE: #19 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer and Counterclaims, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 12, 2014 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Second Motion to Amend. Defendant shall file its Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (in the form contemplated by the instant #19 Second Motion) by 03/19/2014. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/12/2014. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 18 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 4, 2014 Motions Referred: RE: #17 MOTION to Amend #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 4, 2014 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Amend. Defendant shall file its Amended Answer and Counterclaims (in the form contemplated by its instant #17 Motion) by 03/11/2014. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/04/2014. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
March 3, 2014 ELECTRONIC NOTICE to Mark Stafford, Esq. re #17 MOTION to Amend #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . Counsel is reminded to submit a Proposed Order in an editable format compatible with Word to jschroeder@ncmd.uscourts.gov. (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
February 28, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Responses due by 3/24/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tietex Proposed First Amended Answer and Counterclaims)(STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 24, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WHITNEY D. PIERCE on behalf of Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (PIERCE, WHITNEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 24, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D. MARSH PRAUSE on behalf of Plaintiff PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (PRAUSE, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
January 2, 2014 Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE DESIGNATION AND HANDLING OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 1/2/2014 as set out herein. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 31, 2013 Motions Referred: RE: #13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Solomon, Dianne) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
December 27, 2013 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 29, 2013 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. Case-Management Track: Exceptional. Discovery shall conclude 90 days after the Court conducta a Claim Construction Hearing. Mediation should be conducted no later than 30 days prior to the Claim Construction Hearing. The parties are to agree on a Mediator in due course. The parties Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2014. The parties do not consent to reference this case to a Magistrate Judge. ETT: approximately 2 weeks. A jury trial has been demanded. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 29, 2013 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation should be conducted no later than 30 days prior to the claim construction hearing, the exact date to be set by the mediator after consultation with the parties. The parties are to agree on a mediator in due course. (Gammon, Cheryl) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 28, 2013 TEXT ORDER adopting #12 RULE 26F (JOINT) REPORT with the following modification: the authorization to file materials related to a discovery motion under seal without filing a separate sealing motion (which the Court finds generally consistent with persuasive authority finding an absence of a public right of access in that context, see Chicago Tribune Co. v. Bridgestone/Firestone, Inc., 263 F.3d 1304, 1312 (11th Cir. 2001); Anderson v. Cryovac, Inc., 805 F.2d 1, 10 (1st Cir. 1986)) applies only to materials subject to a protective order and does not relieve the parties of the obligation to utilize redaction in lieu of sealing where practicable. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/28/2013. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 25, 2013 Motions Referred: RE: #12 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
October 24, 2013 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC..(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 23, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/28/2013 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
September 20, 2013 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaims by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (COUGHLIN, RICHARD) Modified document title on 9/23/2013. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2013 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim for PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. Answer due by 9/22/2013. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 8/28/2013. (Brubaker, John) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 12, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NEIL C. JONES on behalf of Defendant TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (JONES, NEIL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 12, 2013 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. identifying Corporate Parent TIETEX HOLDING COMPANY, INC. for TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD... (STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 12, 2013 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (STAFFORD, MARK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 6, 2013 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 6, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 6, 2013 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 6, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-1353882.), filed by PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. (COUGHLIN, RICHARD) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 6, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]
August 6, 2013 Case Assigned to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 11/9/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC. v. TIETEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRECISION FABRICS GROUP, INC.
Represented By: PETER D. SIDDOWAY
Represented By: ANTHONY P. DEROSA
Represented By: KIMBERLY BULLOCK GATLING
Represented By: Lance A Lawson
Represented By: LYNNE A. BORCHERS
Represented By: D. MARSH PRAUSE
Represented By: Whitney Demain Pierce
Represented By: Richard Andrew Coughlin
Represented By: Kurt Matthew Rozelsky
Represented By: Peter D Siddoway
Represented By: Lynne A Borchers
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROYAL ADHESIVES AND SEALANTS, LLC.
Represented By: JEFFREY M. REICHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tietex International Ltd
Represented By: William Stevens Brown
Represented By: Neil C Jones
Represented By: Mark A Stafford
Represented By: James Robertson
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Represented By: A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr
Represented By: Samuel W Outten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?