Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Mitchell et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Xtreme Vapes LLC and James H Mitchell
Case Number: 7:2018cv02190
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Spartanburg Office
County: Spartanburg
0 Judge: Henry M Herlong
1 Judge: A Marvin Quattlebaum
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0553
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 14 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 12 - Reason: refiled correctly; Corrected Filing Document Number #13 ; Modified filing date to that of original filing: n/a (sfla)
September 27, 2018 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Hale, Eric)
September 12, 2018 9 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER to 7:18-cv-02190-HMH - PLEASE NOTE FOR YOUR RECORDS AND FUTURE FILINGS. (sfla)
September 10, 2018 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr. Judge Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
August 23, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service as to James H. Mitchell, #2 Affidavit of Service as to Xtreme Vapes, LLC d/b/a Xtreme Vapes)(Hale, Eric)
August 9, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to James H Mitchell, Xtreme Vapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons James H. Mitchell)(alew, )
August 9, 2018 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (alew, )
August 8, 2018 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(alew, )
August 8, 2018 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(alew, )
August 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against James H Mitchell, Xtreme Vapes LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7933803.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Service due by 11/6/2018(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Eric C Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtreme Vapes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?