Causey v. Azar
Plaintiff: Glen D Causey
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 7:2018cv03215
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Petition for Mandamus, and Request for Declaratory Relief against Alex M Azar, II, filed by Glen D Causey. Service due by 3/20/2019 (Turnage, Edwin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen D Causey. Alex M Azar, II served on 12/14/2018, answer due 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 proof of service)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kmca)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Glen D Causey.(kmca)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Petition for Mandamus, and Request for Declaratory Relief against Alex M Azar, II (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8132465), filed by Glen D Causey. Service due by 2/27/2019.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Causey v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen D Causey
Represented By: Edwin Lake Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?