United States of America v. Assorted Firearms Listed in Attachment A
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Assorted Firearms Listed in Attachment A
Claimant: Jerry Devall
Case Number: 7:2018cv03353
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay forfeiture proceedings pending investigation in a related criminal matter for a period of sixty (60) days. This case is stayed until April 2, 2019. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 2/1/19.(sfla)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 2/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Sherard, Carrie)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/14/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/28/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/28/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/24/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/24/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/25/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/25/2019, Discovery due by 7/25/2019, Motion in Limine due by 10/8/2019, Motions due by 8/8/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/20/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 10/15/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 10/22/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 1/25/19. (sfla)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 VERIFIED CLAIM for Seized Property by Claimant Jerry Devall. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Eppes, Frank) Modified on 1/25/2019 to attach cover page as main document, other documents as attachments; to correct filer to claimant who is filing the claim (sfla).
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Assorted Firearms Listed in Attachment A. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(Eppes, Frank)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Langston Eppes on behalf of Assorted Firearms Listed in Attachment A (Eppes, Frank)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Assorted Firearms Listed in Attachment A. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Sherard, Carrie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (sfla)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (sfla)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Assorted Firearms Listed in Attachment A filed by United States of America. Service due by 3/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - List of 143 Firearms)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Assorted Firearms Listed in Attachment A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Firearms Listed in Attachment A
Represented By: Frank Langston Eppes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jerry Devall
Represented By: Frank Langston Eppes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?