Herr v. ADO Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Walter Herr
Defendant: Flair21 Corporation, ADO Corporation and Stefaan Joos
Case Number: 7:2018cv03420
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ADO Corporation, Flair21 Corporation, Stefaan Joos.(Smith, Joseph)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION for Defendants to pay arbitration fees by Walter Herr. Response to Motion due by 2/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Jefferson, Meliah). Added MOTION for Defendants to pay arbitration fees on 1/28/2019: to add additional relief listed in document (kmca).
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Flair21 Corporation answer due 2/7/2019; ADO Corporation answer due 2/7/2019; Stefaan Joos answer due 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Deadline Extension)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Owen Smith on behalf of ADO Corporation, Flair21 Corporation, Stefaan Joos (Smith, Joseph)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Herr. ADO Corporation served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019; Flair21 Corporation served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019; Stefaan Joos served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ADO Corporation, Flair21 Corporation, Stefaan Joos. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Flair21 Corporation, #2 Summons for Stephen Joos)(kmca)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Walter Herr.(kmca)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADO Corporation, Flair21 Corporation, Stefaan Joos (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8156114), filed by Walter Herr. Service due by 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- The Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- First Supplement, #3 Exhibit C- Second Supplement)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herr v. ADO Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flair21 Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Owen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADO Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Owen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefaan Joos
Represented By: Joseph Owen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Herr
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?