American Tube Fab LLC v. Kent International Inc et al
Plaintiff: American Tube Fab LLC
Defendant: Kent International Inc, Bicycle Corporation of America, iBert Inc and Injectron Corporation
Case Number: 7:2019cv01798
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER ENTERED - granting #16 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/12/19. (sfla)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 3/26/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/12/19. (sfla) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/12/2019) to correct case number) (sfla, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Kent International Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Exhibit A), #2 Proposed Order with redlined changes (Exhibit B))Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Schanen, Giles)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Kent International Inc.(Schanen, Giles)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Kent International Inc.(Schanen, Giles)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Kent International Inc.(Schanen, Giles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Tube Fab LLC.(Weaver, Zachary)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kent International Inc, filed by American Tube Fab LLC. Service due by 10/10/2019 (Weaver, Zachary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Filing Notice of Removal)(Schanen, Giles)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER; Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/18/2020, Discovery due by 3/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/2/2020, Motions due by 4/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/15/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/9/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/8/19. (sfla) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct year of Motions due date (sfla).
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Kent International Inc.(Schanen, Giles)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kent International Inc.(abuc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-42-01892. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8522505), filed by Kent International Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Tube Fab LLC v. Kent International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent International Inc
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Represented By: John F Kuppens
Represented By: Katie Elizabeth Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bicycle Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iBert Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Injectron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tube Fab LLC
Represented By: Zachary Lee Weaver
Represented By: William Ryan Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?