Cilwa et al
Appellant: Christopher Cilwa and Anthony J Cilwa
Appellee: John K Fort
Case Number: 7:2019cv01810
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Judgment, #8 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Anthony J Cilwa PO Box 266 Lady Lake, FL 32158 (gpre, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT Action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (gpre, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Appellant did not respond to the Court's Order or pay the filing fee, and the time for response has lapsed. Appellant has failed to prosecute this case and has failed to comply with an Order of this Court. Accordingly, this action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/6/2019. (gpre, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Order, Docket Report, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Anthony J Cilwa PO Box 266 Lady Lake, FL 32158 (gpre, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Appellant must pay the full filing fee of $298 for this appeal in the Bankruptcy Court on or before July 9, 2019. Appellant is directed to file his Designation of Record Bankruptcy Court Clerk of Court. (Filing Fee due by 7/9/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/27/2019. (gpre, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-00263-HB., filed by Anthony J Cilwa. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Transmittal Notice of Appeal) Christopher Cilwa did not sign the appeal but is listed on the bankruptcy tranmittal.(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cilwa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christopher Cilwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Anthony J Cilwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John K Fort
Represented By: Joshua Jennings Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?