Dunbar v. Hassan et al
Plaintiff: Ida N Dunbar
Defendant: Mahammad Barkhard, Adan M Hassan and Sahra Logistics Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv02040
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 26(f) Report by Mahammad Barkhard, Ida N Dunbar, Adan M Hassan, Sahra Logistics Inc. Refiled by clerk to correct event type(alew, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/6/19. (alew, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/27/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/10/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/10/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/1/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/31/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2019, Discovery due by 1/31/2020, Motions due by 3/2/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2020, Mediation Due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/6/19. (alew, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ida N Dunbar.(Tedder, Deon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Mahammad Barkhard, Adan M Hassan, Sahra Logistics Inc.(Chase, Gerald)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email confirmation of extension)(Chase, Gerald)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed State Court Acknowledgment)(Chase, Gerald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sahra Logistics Inc.(alew, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mahammad Barkhard.(alew, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Adan M Hassan.(alew, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-42-01830. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8567829), filed by Adan M Hassan, Mahammad Barkhard, Sahra Logistics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Affidavits of Service)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunbar v. Hassan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahammad Barkhard
Represented By: Mary Grace Carey
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adan M Hassan
Represented By: Mary Grace Carey
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahra Logistics Inc
Represented By: Mary Grace Carey
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida N Dunbar
Represented By: David Fletcher Aylor
Represented By: Deon Terrell Tedder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?