Millwood v. City of Gaffney, The
Plaintiff: Olivia Deann Millwood
Defendant: City of Gaffney, The
Case Number: 7:2019cv02278
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Olivia Deann Millwood.(Shabel, Kenneth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 3/2/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/11/2019. (kric, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/1/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/25/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/24/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/24/2020, Discovery due by 2/24/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/1/2020, Motions due by 3/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/2/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/11/2019. (kric, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: Plaintiff's 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories are due no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the Notice of Removal. (gpre, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Philip Shabel on behalf of Olivia Deann Millwood (Shabel, Kenneth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Olivia Deann Millwood 107 Briarwood Road Spartanburg, SC 29301 with 26.01 interrogatories and pro se guide (kric, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing the pro se plaintiff to complete, sign, and return Rule 26.01 interrogatories by 9/16/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Ordering the plaintiff to keep the Clerk advised in writing of any change of address. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/26/19. (ctuc, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Gaffney, The.(Jolly, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Gaffney, The.(kric, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cherokee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CP1100465. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8613402), filed by City of Gaffney, The. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millwood v. City of Gaffney, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gaffney, The
Represented By: James D Jolly, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Deann Millwood
Represented By: Kenneth Philip Shabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?