Watford v. Liquid Transport Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Watford
Defendant: Liquid Transport Corporation and Dana Transport Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv02499
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Courtney Watford.(Barcroft, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 15 Reason: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures aren't filed with the Court. They should be exchanged between the parties and maintained by each side. Modified filing date to that of original filing: 10/29/2019 Response due date modified to that of original filing: n/a (abuc)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY: The Court held a Rule 16 conference with the parties. The parties are directed to submit a proposed amended scheduling order and responses to Local Rule 26.03 Interrogatories within 14 days. Proceedings held before Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr: Pretrial Conference held on 10/22/2019. (abuc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Liquid Transport Corporation only by Liquid Transport Corporation. (Moseley, Robert)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Dana Transport Inc, Liquid Transport Corporation.(Moseley, Robert)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Dana Transport Inc, Liquid Transport Corporation.(Moseley, Robert)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Courtney Watford.(Barcroft, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgement by State Clerk)(Moseley, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE for 10/21/2019 11:00 AM, in chambers, in Spartanburg 2nd Floor, Donald S Russell Fed Bldg, 201 Magnolia St, Spartanburg before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/11/2019. (abuc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/1/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/25/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/20/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/10/2020, Discovery due by 3/9/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/8/2020, Motions due by 3/23/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/18/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/8/2020, Mediation Due by 4/6/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/11/2019. (abuc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that the Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories are to be filed when a case is first removed from State Court. Please file no later than 9/19/2019.(abuc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Dana Transport Inc, Liquid Transport Corporation.(Moseley, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dana Transport Inc, Liquid Transport Corporation.(abuc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019- CP-42-02589. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8652536), filed by Dana Transport Inc, Liquid Transport Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watford v. Liquid Transport Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liquid Transport Corporation
Represented By: Mary Grace Carey
Represented By: Robert Daniel Moseley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Transport Inc
Represented By: Mary Grace Carey
Represented By: Robert Daniel Moseley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Watford
Represented By: Michael W Barcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?