Ratliff et al v. Avon Products Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ennis Ratliff and Lynda Ratliff
Defendant: Coty Inc, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Breentag Specialties Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Pfizer Inc, Cyprus Mines Corporation, Bi-Lo LLC, Avon Products Inc, Charles B Crystal Company Inc, Brenntag North America Inc, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc and Brenntag Specialties Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv02570
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Remand Case to State Circuit Court Response filed by Avon Products Inc, Bi-Lo LLC, Charles B Crystal Company Inc, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, Pfizer Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/31/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Consent Emails), #2 Exhibit 2 (Affidavit of William P. Early, Esquire), #3 Exhibit 3 (Affidavit of Karen Abravanel), #4 Exhibit 4 (Affidavit of Amy Harmon Geddes), #5 Exhibit 5 (Affidavit of Sandra M. Ko), #6 Exhibit 6 (Agred Stipulations and Motion to Bifurcate))(Geddes, Amy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/18/2019.(abuc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frank J. Wathen for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8727461) by Ennis Ratliff, Lynda Ratliff. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for Admission PHV, #2 Supporting Documents Letter of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McVey, Theile) (Main Document 43 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 10/18/2019) (abuc).
October 10, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Remand Case to State Circuit Court by Ennis Ratliff, Lynda Ratliff. Response to Motion due by 10/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Proofs of Service)No proposed order.(McVey, Theile)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 11/20/2019 02:30 PM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/9/2019. (abuc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 40 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/23/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/9/2020, Discovery due by 4/6/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/5/2020, Motions due by 4/20/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/15/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2020, Mediation Due by 5/4/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/9/2019. (abuc) (Main Document 40 replaced on 10/9/2019) (abuc, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 39 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brenntag North America Inc.(Inabinet, George)
October 9, 2019 Filing 38 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brenntag Specialties Inc.(Inabinet, George)
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by Brenntag North America Inc.(Inabinet, George) (Main Document 37 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 10/3/2019) (abuc).
October 2, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by Brenntag Specialties Inc.(Inabinet, George) (Main Document 36 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 10/3/2019) (abuc).
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charles B Crystal Company Inc.(Early, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cyprus Mines Corporation.(Frick, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 33 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Frick, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Charles B Crystal Company Inc. (Early, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 31 Plaintiffs' Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ennis Ratliff, Lynda Ratliff.(McVey, Theile)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 Defendant Coty, Inc.'s Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Coty Inc.(Harris, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 28 Avon Products Inc ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by Avon Products Inc.(Elliott, James)
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Avon Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email of Counsel)(Elliott, James) (Attachment 1 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user and to edit text on 9/23/2019) (abuc).
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of Avon Products Inc (Elliott, James)
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Conner, Ryan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Coty Inc. (Harris, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Coty Inc.(Harris, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David Grant Harris, II on behalf of Coty Inc (Harris, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(Conner, Ryan) (Main Document 21 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 9/19/2019) (abuc).
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Charles B Crystal Company Inc.(Early, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Early on behalf of Charles B Crystal Company Inc (Early, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Bi-Lo LLC.(Geddes, Amy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pfizer Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(Conner, Ryan) (Main Document 14 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 9/18/2019) (abuc).
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson.(Conner, Ryan) (Main Document 13 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 9/18/2019) (abuc).
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs are reminded that the Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories are to be filed when a case is first removed from State Court and Defendants are reminded that the Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories are to be filed when an answer is first filed. Please file no later than 9/20/2019. (abuc) (abuc, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Cyprus Mines Corporation.(Conner, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Conner, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Frick on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation (Frick, Scott)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Moffatt Grier McDonald on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation (McDonald, Moffatt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Conner on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation (Conner, William)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Pfizer Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bi-Lo LLC.(abuc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-42-02804. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8664268), filed by Bi-Lo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Report for State Court Action, #3 Certificate of Service)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratliff et al v. Avon Products Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty Inc
Represented By: David Grant Harris, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breentag Specialties Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Ryan Wade Conner
Represented By: Louis P Herns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Mines Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bi-Lo LLC
Represented By: Amy Harmon Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products Inc
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Represented By: Megan Christine White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B Crystal Company Inc
Represented By: William P Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America Inc
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc
Represented By: Ryan Wade Conner
Represented By: Louis P Herns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties Inc
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ennis Ratliff
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: Jamie Rae Rutkoski
Represented By: John Daniel Kassel
Represented By: Frank J Wathen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Ratliff
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: Jamie Rae Rutkoski
Represented By: John Daniel Kassel
Represented By: Frank J Wathen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?