Sucher et al v. Prisma Health-Upstate et al
Plaintiff: Blair Jones Sucher and Robert J Sucher
Defendant: Aqil Surka, Prisma Health-Upstate and Anne-Marie Edwards
Case Number: 7:2019cv03379
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry: phone conference held with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. The parties are directed to submit responses to Local Civil Rule (D.S.C.) 26.03 interrogatories within 14 days. In the event the parties determine it is necessary at this stage, they are further directed to submit a joint proposed amended scheduling order within 14 days. (alew, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 1/30/2020 03:00 PM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/23/2019. (abuc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/13/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/9/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/1/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/1/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/21/2020, Discovery due by 6/22/2020, Motion in Limine due by 8/19/2020, Motions due by 7/6/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/28/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/18/2020, Mediation Due by 7/20/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/23/2019. (abuc) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/27/2019) (alew, ). Modified on 12/27/2019 to correct deadline dates on pleading as noted (alew, ).
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anne-Marie Edwards, Prisma Health-Upstate, Aqil Surka.(abuc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Anne-Marie Edwards, Prisma Health-Upstate, Aqil Surka. (Alexander, J) Modified to remove attachment and file as separate entry #8 on 12/23/2019 (abuc).
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert J Sucher, Blair Jones Sucher. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service) Refiled to correct event type.(abuc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit A-Affidavit of Seth Adam Hollander, MD . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Josh A. Lane, MD)(Perkins, Cheryl)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anne-Marie Edwards, Prisma Health-Upstate, Aqil Surka. (abuc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blair Jones Sucher, Robert J Sucher.(abuc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anne-Marie Edwards, Prisma Health-Upstate, Aqil Surka (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8806116.), filed by Robert J Sucher, Blair Jones Sucher. Service due by 3/2/2020(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sucher et al v. Prisma Health-Upstate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blair Jones Sucher
Represented By: Charles W Whetstone, Jr
Represented By: Cheryl F Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Sucher
Represented By: Charles W Whetstone, Jr
Represented By: Cheryl F Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqil Surka
Represented By: J Ben Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisma Health-Upstate
Represented By: J Ben Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne-Marie Edwards
Represented By: J Ben Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?