Calloway et al v. University of South Carolina
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Calloway and Brad Calloway
Defendant: University of South Carolina
Case Number: 7:2020cv00726
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brad Calloway, Jennifer L Calloway.(Miller, Bruce)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowlegement of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Turner, Charles)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jill Zwagerman added for plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/21/2020.(kric, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jill Zwagerman ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8957754) by Brad Calloway, Jennifer L Calloway. Response to Motion due by 3/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Miller, Bruce)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/5/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/19/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 3/19/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/29/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/29/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/29/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/29/2020, Discovery due by 7/29/2020, Motions due by 8/12/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/5/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 11/4/2020, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 2/14/2020. (kric, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by University of South Carolina. (kric, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by University of South Carolina.(kric, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CP4204210. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8946525), filed by University of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Certificate of Service)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calloway et al v. University of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Calloway
Represented By: Bruce E Miller
Represented By: Jill Zwagerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Calloway
Represented By: Bruce E Miller
Represented By: Jill Zwagerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of South Carolina
Represented By: Wilson S Sheldon
Represented By: Charles F Turner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?